This case was last updated from Leon County Courts on 10/14/2021 at 13:10:47 (UTC).

ENVISION CREDIT UNION vs KEITT, CHARLES

Case Summary

On 10/08/2021 ENVISION CREDIT UNION filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against KEITT, CHARLES. This case was filed in Leon County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Leon, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is AUGUSTUS AIKENS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************2277

  • Filing Date:

    10/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Leon, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

AUGUSTUS AIKENS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ENVISION CREDIT UNION

Po Box 5198 3181797

Tallahassee, FL 32314

Defendant

KEITT, CHARLES

Conyers, GA 30094

 

Court Documents

PAYMENT $185.00 RECEIPT #1597291

10/13/2021: PAYMENT $185.00 RECEIPT #1597291

SUMMONS ISSUED

10/8/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

10/8/2021: STATEMENT OF CLAIM

AFFIDAVIT OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE

10/8/2021: AFFIDAVIT OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE

AFFIDAVIT

10/8/2021: AFFIDAVIT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

10/8/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/09/2021
  • HearingEvent: PRETRIAL SC; Start: 9:30 AM; Location: CA1; Judge: AIKENS; Source: BM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $185.00 RECEIPT #1597291

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketJUDGE AIKENS, AUGUSTUS D JR: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketPRETRIAL SC SET FOR 11/09/2021 AT 9:30 AM IN CA1, JDG: AIKENS, AUGUSTUS D JR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • DispositionAction Description: SMALL CLAIMS MORE THAN $500 BUT NOT MORE THAN $2500.00; Open/Reopen Status: OPEN; Open/Reopen Date: 10/8/2021 1:21:56 PM; Judge: AIKENS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ENVISION CREDIT UNION is a litigant