This case was last updated from Leon County Courts on 10/04/2021 at 06:22:11 (UTC).

ENVISION CREDIT UNION vs GISSENDANER, RAYMOND LOUIS

Case Summary

On 09/20/2021 ENVISION CREDIT UNION filed an Other lawsuit against GISSENDANER, RAYMOND LOUIS. This case was filed in Leon County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Leon, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MONIQUE RICHARDSON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************2239

  • Filing Date:

    09/20/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Leon, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MONIQUE RICHARDSON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ENVISION CREDIT UNION

C/O J. Blair Boyd, Esquire P.O. Box 3637 3178371

Tallahassee, FL 32315-3637

Defendant

GISSENDANER, RAYMOND LOUIS

Tallahassee, FL 32301

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JOHN BLAIR BOYD

Post Office Box 36372878313

Tallahassee, FL 32315

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

9/20/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

CIVIL COVER SHEET

9/20/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

STATEMENT OF CLAIM/COMPLAINT

9/20/2021: STATEMENT OF CLAIM/COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ISSUED

9/20/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED

PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #1594176

9/27/2021: PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #1594176

UNIFORM ORDER FOR ACTIVE, DIFFERENTIAL CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT E-NOTICED via email on 2021-09-27

9/27/2021: UNIFORM ORDER FOR ACTIVE, DIFFERENTIAL CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT E-NOTICED via email on 2021-09-27

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUNIFORM ORDER FOR ACTIVE, DIFFERENTIAL CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT E-NOTICED via email on 2021-09-27

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #1594176

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketJUDGE RICHARDSON, MONIQUE R: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DispositionAction Description: COUNTY CIVIL OVER $8,000 BUT LESS THAN $15,000; Open/Reopen Status: OPEN; Open/Reopen Date: 9/20/2021 11:36:48 AM; Judge: RICHARDSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM/COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ENVISION CREDIT UNION is a litigant