This case was last updated from Leon County Courts on 01/21/2021 at 12:07:38 (UTC).

EATON, STEPHEN E vs EATON, AMANDA DOUGLAS

Case Summary

On 01/14/2021 EATON, STEPHEN E filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against EATON, AMANDA DOUGLAS. This case was filed in Leon County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Leon, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is JOSHUA HAWKES. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************0116

  • Filing Date:

    01/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Leon, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

JOSHUA HAWKES

 

Party Details

Petitioner

EATON, STEPHEN E

Tallahassee, FL 32312

Respondent

EATON, AMANDA DOUGLAS

Tallahassee, FL 32309

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

TRUDY E INNES RICHARDSON

487 E. Tennessee Street Suite 1 3053583

Tallahassee, FL 32303

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketCOPY OF DRIVER LICENSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketHUSBANDS NOTICE OF FILING SPECIAL SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketANSWER, WAIVER, AND REQUEST FOR COPY OF FINAL JUDGMENT OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketMARITAL SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketSTANDING FAMILY LAW PRE-TRIAL COURT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketPAYMENT $397.50 RECEIPT #1548178

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketJUDGE HAWKES, JOSHUA M: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DispositionAction Description: DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE; Open/Reopen Status: OPEN; Open/Reopen Date: 1/14/2021 4:16:17 PM; Judge: HAWKES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF COMPLETION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF COMPLETION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketUNIFORM CHILD CUSTODY JURISDICTION AND ENFORCEMENT ACT (UCCJA) AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketFINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT OF RESPONDENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketFINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT OF PETITIONER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketUNIFORM CHILD CUSTODY JURISDICTION AND ENFORCEMENT ACT (UCCJA) AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketPETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer TRUDY E INNES RICHARDSON