This case was last updated from Leon County Courts on 08/13/2022 at 15:49:15 (UTC).

DORIS MALOY AS LEON COUNTY TAX COLLECTOR vs DORIS MALOY AS LEON COUNTY TAX COLLECTOR

Case Summary

On 05/04/2022 DORIS MALOY AS LEON COUNTY TAX COLLECTOR filed an Other lawsuit against DORIS MALOY AS LEON COUNTY TAX COLLECTOR. This case was filed in Leon County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Leon, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is JOHN COOPER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************0734

  • Filing Date:

    05/04/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Leon, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

JOHN COOPER

 

Party Details

Defendants and Plaintiffs

DORIS MALOY AS LEON COUNTY TAX COLLECTOR

315 S Calhoun St Ste 2101240168

Tallahassee, FL 32301

EXTREME CARPET CARE, INC.

C/O Jason Black, Post Office Box 12174 3222387

Tallahassee, FL 32317

SEMINOLE RIDGE APTS

Tallahassee, FL 32303

HOAGIES AND HEROS EATERY AND PUB INC

777 Capital Circle S W2464777

Tallahassee, FL 32310

228 DIXIE LLC

306 Dixie Drive, 3222417

Tallahassee, FL 32304

UNIQUE VIDEO CREATIONS INC

1106-A Thomasville Road, 3101997

Tallahassee, FL 32303

ARCHON DEVELOPMENT CORPORATION

250 John Knox Road, Ste 4 3101998

Tallahassee, FL 32303

LJC WESTCOTT LLC

3909 Reserve Dr, 3182572

Tallahassee, FL 32311-8200

THE ST JOE COMPANY

133 S Watersound Parkway2192143

Waersound, FL 32413

HEFFLEY AND ASSOCIATES INC

8975 Winged Foot Drive2896301

Tallahassee, FL 32312

VILLA SAN MARCO LLC

2400 W Tharpe St489047

Tallahassee, FL 32303

DIVERSE COMPUTING INC

3717 Apalachee Parkway, Ste 102 3222414

Tallahassee, FL 32311

FLORIDA PRINTING COMPANY

2778 Capital Circle Ne, 3222415

Tallahassee, FL 32308

DATAMAXX CAPITAL HOLDING LLC

2001 Drayton Dr1185894

Tallahassee, FL 32311

WESTSCOTT CONSTRUCTION INC

3927 North Monroe Street, 2974659

Tallahassee, FL 32303

GAINES AND SON STRIPING INC

8771 Jimerce Ct, 3030746

Tallahassee, FL 32309

HEALTH MANAGEMENT ASSOCIATES I

301 S Bronough Street, 500 3222418

Tallahassee, FL 32301

WARD INTERNATIONAL TRUCKS INC

3101 Commonwealth Blvd, 3112903

Tallahassee, FL 32303

FASTLANE MART INC

3497 N Monroe Street2826311

Tallahassee, FL 32303

CASSINOVAS HAIR STUDIO

Tallahassee, FL 32304

390 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

TIMOTHY R QUALLS

216 South Monroe Street2901853

Tallahassee, FL 32301

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF FILING

8/10/2022: NOTICE OF FILING

RETURNED MAIL

8/8/2022: RETURNED MAIL

RETURNED MAIL

8/8/2022: RETURNED MAIL

RETURNED MAIL

8/8/2022: RETURNED MAIL

RETURNED MAIL

8/8/2022: RETURNED MAIL

RETURNED MAIL

8/8/2022: RETURNED MAIL

CERTIFIED NOTICE CARD RETURNED- CAMPFIELD ELOGIA ROLLINS AUTO REPAIR

8/5/2022: CERTIFIED NOTICE CARD RETURNED- CAMPFIELD ELOGIA ROLLINS AUTO REPAIR

CERTIFIED NOTICE CARD RETURNED - SKINNY LABS INC

8/5/2022: CERTIFIED NOTICE CARD RETURNED - SKINNY LABS INC

CERTIFIED NOTICE CARD RETURNED - ROYAL ROOFING & RESTORATION LLC

8/5/2022: CERTIFIED NOTICE CARD RETURNED - ROYAL ROOFING & RESTORATION LLC

CERTIFIED NOTICE CARD RETURNED- C&C PLUMBING CONTRACTORS INC

8/5/2022: CERTIFIED NOTICE CARD RETURNED- C&C PLUMBING CONTRACTORS INC

CERTIFIED NOTICE CARD RETURNED- MARIE LININGSTONS STEAK HOUSE

8/3/2022: CERTIFIED NOTICE CARD RETURNED- MARIE LININGSTONS STEAK HOUSE

CERTIFIED NOTICE CARD RETURNED- DATAMAXX CAPITAL HOLDING LLC

7/28/2022: CERTIFIED NOTICE CARD RETURNED- DATAMAXX CAPITAL HOLDING LLC

CERTIFIED NOTICE CARD RETURNED- DATAMAXX APPLIED TECHNOLOGIES INC

7/28/2022: CERTIFIED NOTICE CARD RETURNED- DATAMAXX APPLIED TECHNOLOGIES INC

RETURNED MAIL

7/25/2022: RETURNED MAIL

RETURNED MAIL

7/25/2022: RETURNED MAIL

RETURNED MAIL

7/25/2022: RETURNED MAIL

CERTIFIED NOTICE CARD RETURNED- GTO ACCESS SYSTEMS LLC

7/22/2022: CERTIFIED NOTICE CARD RETURNED- GTO ACCESS SYSTEMS LLC

CERTIFIED NOTICE CARD RETURNED- SOUTHERN SASS HAIR SALON

7/22/2022: CERTIFIED NOTICE CARD RETURNED- SOUTHERN SASS HAIR SALON

240 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/11/2022
  • HearingEvent: HEARING; Start: 3:30 PM; Location: ZOOMC; Judge: COOPER; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURNED MAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURNED MAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURNED MAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURNED MAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURNED MAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFIED NOTICE CARD RETURNED- CAMPFIELD ELOGIA ROLLINS AUTO REPAIR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFIED NOTICE CARD RETURNED - SKINNY LABS INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFIED NOTICE CARD RETURNED - ROYAL ROOFING & RESTORATION LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
238 More Docket Entries
  • 05/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRECEIPT # 1636796 MODIFIED: PAYMENT $1,425.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRECEIPT # 1636796 MODIFIED: PAYMENT $1,422.50

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRECEIPT # 1636796 MODIFIED: PAYMENT $1,422.50

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRECEIPT # 1636796 MODIFIED: PAYMENT $402.50 REFUND $1,022.50

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • DispositionAction Description: OTHER CIRCUIT CIVIL; Open/Reopen Status: OPEN; Open/Reopen Date: 5/4/2022; Judge: COOPER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUNIFORM ORDER FOR ACTIVE, DIFFERENTIAL CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT E-NOTICED VIA EMAIL ON 2022-05-04

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $402.50 REFUND $1,022.50 RECEIPT #1636796

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • DocketJUDGE COOPER, JOHN C: ASSIGNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DORIS MALOY, AS THE TAX COLLECTOR OF LEON COUNTY, is a litigant

Latest cases where LJC WESTCOTT LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where 228 DIXIE LLC DBA TORCHLIGHT TOWNHOMES is a litigant

Latest cases where EXTREME CARPET CARE, INC. is a litigant