This case was last updated from Leon County Courts on 10/06/2020 at 15:30:13 (UTC).

DKS HOUSING SUB I LLC vs HARVEY, RAYLAWNDA

Case Summary

On 09/17/2020 DKS HOUSING SUB I LLC filed a Property - Other Property lawsuit against HARVEY, RAYLAWNDA. This case was filed in Leon County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Leon, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is JASON JONES. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************1672

  • Filing Date:

    09/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Leon, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

JASON JONES

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DKS HOUSING SUB I LLC

519 E Park Ave 3114034

Tallahassee, FL 32301-2524

Defendant

HARVEY, RAYLAWNDA

Tallahassee, FL 32301-6369

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ELWIN R THRASHER

908 North Gadsden St2487616

Tallahassee, FL 32303

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

9/17/2020: CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT FILED

9/17/2020: COMPLAINT FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED

9/17/2020: SUMMONS ISSUED

PAYMENT $195.00 RECEIPT #1528996

9/18/2020: PAYMENT $195.00 RECEIPT #1528996

RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED-POSTED

9/21/2020: RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED-POSTED

MOTION FOR DEFAULT- ISSUED 10/1/2020

9/29/2020: MOTION FOR DEFAULT- ISSUED 10/1/2020

MOTION FOR ENTRY OF FINAL JUDGMENT

9/29/2020: MOTION FOR ENTRY OF FINAL JUDGMENT

DEFAULT AND FINAL JUDGMENT - Recorded (OR 5497.226 / 20200057740)

10/1/2020: DEFAULT AND FINAL JUDGMENT - Recorded (OR 5497.226 / 20200057740)

WRIT OF POSSESSION

10/5/2020: WRIT OF POSSESSION

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWRIT OF POSSESSION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • DispositionDEFAULT & FINAL JUDGMENT; Action Description: LANDLORD-TENANT NON-MONETARY; Open/Reopen Status: CLOS; Open/Reopen Date: 9/17/2020; Judge: JONES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFAULT AND FINAL JUDGMENT - Recorded (OR 5497.226 / 20200057740)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR ENTRY OF FINAL JUDGMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT- ISSUED 10/1/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED-POSTED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketCOPIES MAILED TO TENANT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $195.00 RECEIPT #1528996

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketJUDGE JONES, JASON LEE: ASSIGNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer ELWIN R THRASHER