This case was last updated from Leon County Courts on 03/02/2023 at 08:26:42 (UTC).

DISCOVER BANK vs LUNSFORD, EDWARD C

Case Summary

On 07/01/2021 DISCOVER BANK filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against LUNSFORD, EDWARD C. This case was filed in Leon County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Leon, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is STEFANIE NEWLIN. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************1365

  • Filing Date:

    07/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Leon, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

STEFANIE NEWLIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DISCOVER BANK

Defendant

LUNSFORD, EDWARD C

Garnishee

CAPITAL CITY BANK

 

Court Documents

LETTER FROM PLAINTIFFS ATTORNEY

7/8/2022: LETTER FROM PLAINTIFFS ATTORNEY

ANSWER TO WRIT OF GARNISHMENT

6/28/2022: ANSWER TO WRIT OF GARNISHMENT

RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED CAPITAL CITY BANK

6/27/2022: RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED CAPITAL CITY BANK

NOTICE TO INDIVIDUAL DEFENDANT(S) PURSUANT TO FLORIDA STATUTE 77.041(1)(2)

6/15/2022: NOTICE TO INDIVIDUAL DEFENDANT(S) PURSUANT TO FLORIDA STATUTE 77.041(1)(2)

PAYMENT $85.00 RECEIPT #1643431

6/6/2022: PAYMENT $85.00 RECEIPT #1643431

WRIT OF GARNISHMENT

6/4/2022: WRIT OF GARNISHMENT

MOTION FOR WRIT OF GARNISHMENT AFTER JUDGMENT

6/4/2022: MOTION FOR WRIT OF GARNISHMENT AFTER JUDGMENT

MEDIATION REPORT

4/8/2022: MEDIATION REPORT

FINAL JUDGMENT - Recorded (OR 5720.1358 / 20220023895)

4/6/2022: FINAL JUDGMENT - Recorded (OR 5720.1358 / 20220023895)

COURT MINUTES

4/5/2022: COURT MINUTES

ORDER TO PROVIDE TELEPHONE NUMBER FOR APRIL 5, 2022 PRE-TRIAL MEDIATION CONFERENCE

3/23/2022: ORDER TO PROVIDE TELEPHONE NUMBER FOR APRIL 5, 2022 PRE-TRIAL MEDIATION CONFERENCE

NOTICE OF HEARING

2/10/2022: NOTICE OF HEARING

FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

2/4/2022: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

MOTION FOR ENTRY OF FINAL JUDGMENT

2/4/2022: MOTION FOR ENTRY OF FINAL JUDGMENT

AFFIDAVIT OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE

2/4/2022: AFFIDAVIT OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE

CERTIFICATION OF PLAINTIFFS ATTORNEY

2/4/2022: CERTIFICATION OF PLAINTIFFS ATTORNEY

NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVIT OF INDEBTEDNESS

2/4/2022: NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVIT OF INDEBTEDNESS

COURT MINUTES

11/16/2021: COURT MINUTES

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: LETR; Docket Text: LETTER FROM PLAINTIFFS ATTORNEY; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/03/2022
  • DocketDocket Code: DEACTATT; Docket Text: CASE CLOSED 30 DAYS PER RJA 2.505(F) DEACTIVATE ATTORNEY for ATT RUTH VAFEK on 07/03/2022; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: GRAN; Docket Text: ANSWER TO WRIT OF GARNISHMENT; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: ROSE; Docket Text: RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED CAPITAL CITY BANK; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: NOGR; Docket Text: NOTICE TO INDIVIDUAL DEFENDANT(S) PURSUANT TO FLORIDA STATUTE 77.041(1)(2); Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: RECEIPT; Docket Text: PAYMENT $85.00 RECEIPT #1643431; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: WRGA; Docket Text: WRIT OF GARNISHMENT; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: MWRG; Docket Text: MOTION FOR WRIT OF GARNISHMENT AFTER JUDGMENT; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2022
  • DocketDocket Code: DEACTATT; Docket Text: CASE CLOSED 30 DAYS PER RJA 2.505(F) DEACTIVATE ATTORNEY for ATT JONATHAN TEKELL on 05/08/2022; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2022
  • DocketDocket Code: DEACTATT; Docket Text: CASE CLOSED 30 DAYS PER RJA 2.505(F) DEACTIVATE ATTORNEY for ATT BRETT BURKETT on 05/08/2022; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
21 More Docket Entries
  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: RECEIPT; Docket Text: PAYMENT $10.00 RECEIPT #1590610; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: SUIS; Docket Text: ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: ROSU; Docket Text: LETTER OF CANCELLATION OF SERVICE OF PROCESS AND RETURN OF SUMMONS TO ISSUING CLERK OF COURT; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • HearingEvent: PRETRIAL SC; Start: 9:30 AM; Location: CA1; Judge: NEWLIN; Result: CONTINUED; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: RECEIPT; Docket Text: PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #1579168; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • DocketDocket Code: a002; Docket Text: JUDGE NEWLIN, STEFANIE M: ASSIGNED; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • DocketDocket Code: a120; Docket Text: PRETRIAL SC SET FOR 08/03/2021 AT 9:30 AM IN CA1, JDG: NEWLIN, STEFANIE M; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: SUIS; Docket Text: SUMMONS ISSUED; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: COCOMP_SC; Docket Text: STATEMENT OF CLAIM/COMPLAINT; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: CCS; Docket Text: CIVIL COVER SHEET; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less