This case was last updated from Leon County Courts on 01/26/2023 at 11:42:32 (UTC).

DISCOVER BANK vs CURRY, JACQUELINE

Case Summary

On 12/02/2022 DISCOVER BANK filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against CURRY, JACQUELINE. This case was filed in Leon County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Leon, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is AUGUSTUS AIKENS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************2291

  • Filing Date:

    12/02/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Leon, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

AUGUSTUS AIKENS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DISCOVER BANK

100 Second Ave South Suite 306S, 3263193

Saint Petersburg, FL 33701

Defendant

CURRY, JACQUELINE

Tallahassee, FL 32304-1648

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JESSICA J FAGEN

100 Second Avenue South Ste 306S, 3127853

Saint Petersburg, FL 33701

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

12/2/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

STATEMENT OF CLAIM/COMPLAINT

12/2/2022: STATEMENT OF CLAIM/COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ISSUED

12/2/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED

PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #1678038

12/2/2022: PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #1678038

RETURN OF SERVICE UNEXECUTED - J. CURRY

12/29/2022: RETURN OF SERVICE UNEXECUTED - J. CURRY

ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED

12/29/2022: ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED

PAYMENT $10.00 RECEIPT #1683130

1/3/2023: PAYMENT $10.00 RECEIPT #1683130

COURT MINUTES

1/3/2023: COURT MINUTES

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/07/2023
  • HearingEvent: PRETRIAL SC; Start: 9:30 AM; Location: CA1; Judge: AIKENS; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • HearingEvent: PRETRIAL SC; Start: 9:30 AM; Location: CA1; Judge: AIKENS; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: CTCM; Docket Text: COURT MINUTES; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • DocketDocket Code: a120; Docket Text: PRETRIAL SC SET FOR 02/07/2023 AT 9:30 AM IN CA1, JDG: AIKENS, AUGUSTUS D JR; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: RECEIPT; Docket Text: PAYMENT $10.00 RECEIPT #1683130; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: SUIS; Docket Text: ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: ROSU; Docket Text: RETURN OF SERVICE UNEXECUTED - J. CURRY; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DispositionAction Description: SMALL CLAIMS MORE THAN $2500.00 BUT NOT MORE THAN $5000; Open/Reopen Status: OPEN; Open/Reopen Date: 12/2/2022 2:15:45 PM; Judge: AIKENS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: RECEIPT; Docket Text: PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #1678038; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: SUIS; Docket Text: SUMMONS ISSUED; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: COCOMP_SC; Docket Text: STATEMENT OF CLAIM/COMPLAINT; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: CCS; Docket Text: CIVIL COVER SHEET; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketDocket Code: a002; Docket Text: JUDGE AIKENS, AUGUSTUS D JR: ASSIGNED; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketDocket Code: a120; Docket Text: PRETRIAL SC SET FOR 01/03/2023 AT 9:30 AM IN CA1, JDG: AIKENS, AUGUSTUS D JR; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DISCOVER BANK is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FAGEN , JESSICA J