This case was last updated from Leon County Courts on 04/29/2020 at 13:33:57 (UTC).

DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY vs HAYES, REGINA C

Case Summary

On 10/18/2018 DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against HAYES, REGINA C. This case was filed in Leon County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Leon, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are ANGELA DEMPSEY and KAREN GIEVERS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************2272

  • Filing Date:

    10/18/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Leon, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

ANGELA DEMPSEY

KAREN GIEVERS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY

3000 Bayport Drive Suite 880 2995594

Tampa, FL 33607

Defendants

THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA DEPARTMENT OF TREASUR

400 North Tampa Street Suite 3200 2995599

Tampa, FL 33602

SEARS ROEBUCK AND CO A NEW YORK CORPORATION

C/O 1200 S Pine Island Rd 3011133

Plantation, FL 33324

HAYES, REGINA C

Tallahassee, FL 32309

THE UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF REGINA C HAYES

Tallahassee, FL 32309

JACK W HAYES AKA JACK WILBUR HAYES JR IF LIVING BU

THE UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION

Tallahassee, FL 32309

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/14/2020
  • DispositionAction Description: REOPENED; Open/Reopen Status: REOPEN; Open/Reopen Date: 4/14/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • HearingEvent: FORECLOSURE SALE; Start: 11:00 AM; Location: 100; Judge: FORECLOSURE SALE; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • HearingEvent: NON-JURY TRIAL; Start: 2:00 PM; Location: 301E; Judge: DEMPSEY; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • DispositionNON JURY TRIAL; Action Description: MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE HOMESTEAD RESIDENTIAL MORE THAN $50,000 BUT LESS THAN $250,000; Open/Reopen Status: OPEN; Open/Reopen Date: 10/18/2018; Judge: DEMPSEY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • HearingEvent: NON-JURY TRIAL; Start: 8:45 AM; Location: 365D; Judge: GIEVERS; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SEARS ROEBUCK & COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where Unite States of America Dept of Treasury is a litigant

Latest cases where Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, as Trustee, in Trust for Registered Holders of Long Beach Mortgage Loan Trust 2006-6, Asset-backed Certificates, Series 2006-6 is a litigant