Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Leon County Courts on 10/05/2020 at 06:28:33 (UTC).

Decedent: ONEAL, ANNIE L Personal Rep.: QUARLES, MARDRIC

Case Summary

On 07/29/2020 Decedent ONEAL, ANNIE L Personal Rep QUARLES, MARDRIC was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Leon County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Leon, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is ROBERT LONG. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************0653

  • Filing Date:

    07/29/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Leon County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Leon, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

ROBERT LONG

 

Party Details

Not Yet Classified

BETHEL MISSIONARY BAPTIST CHURCH/BETHEL EMPOWERMEN

Tallahassee, FL 32301

WALDEN, JACQUELYN

Wimauma, FL 33598

ONEAL, RICHARD

Jacksonville, FL 32208

QUARLES, MARDRIC

Tampa, FL 33607

ONEAL, BEULAH MAE

Jacksonville, FL 32208

BELL, LINDA R

WALDEN, STEVEN

Brandon, FL 33511

STRICKLAND, JANICE

Valdosta, GA 31602

DAVIS, ANTONIO

Lakeland, FL 33810

MCCORMICK, GLORIA

Tampa, FL 33610

KEATON, CHANDRA

Tampa, FL 33619

MCNAIR, SANDRA

Riverview, FL 33569

RHODES, WILMA

Saint Petersburg, FL 33713

JONES, ESSIE ONEAL

ONEAL, BENJAMIN HARRIS II

Jacksonville, FL 32208

ONEAL, WILLIE CECIL

WASHINGTON, INEZ ONEAL

COBBERT, ROSA YVONNE

WALDEN, CLARICE ONEAL

JONES, SHIRLEY ONEAL

Jacksonville, FL 32208

Applicant and Not Yet Classified

QUARLES, MARDRIC

Tampa, FL 33607

39 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Applicant and Not Yet Classified Attorney

KANDACE ELAINE RUDD

1632 Metropolitan Circle 2965896

Tallahassee, FL 32308

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/04/2020
  • DocketLETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION - Recorded (OR 5485.1535 / 20200051377)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • DocketORDER ADMITTING WILL TO PROBATE AND APPOINTING PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE - Recorded (OR 5485.1534 / 20200051376)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • DocketOATH OF WITNESS TO WILL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • DocketDEATH CERTIFICATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • DocketPAYMENT $400.00 RECEIPT #1521649

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • DocketJUDGE LONG, ROBERT E JR: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • DispositionAction Description: FORMAL ADMINISTRATION; Open/Reopen Status: OPEN; Open/Reopen Date: 7/29/2020 3:22:17 PM; Judge: LONG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NO FLORIDA ESTATE TAX DUE - Recorded (OR 5470.2240 / 20200042708)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • DocketWAIVER OF PRIORITY, CONSENT TO APPOINTMENT OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE AND WAIVER OF BOND

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 07/29/2020
  • DocketWAIVER OF PRIORITY, CONSENT TO APPOINTMENT OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE AND WAIVER OF BOND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • DocketWAIVER OF PRIORITY, CONSENT TO APPOINTMENT OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE AND WAIVER OF BOND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • DocketCONSENT TO APPOINTMENT OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE AND WAIVER OF NOTICE AND BOND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • DocketWAIVER OF PRIORITY, CONSENT TO APPOINTMENT OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE AND WAIVER OF BOND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • DocketWAIVER OF PRIORITY, CONSENT TO APPOINTMENT OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE AND WAIVER OF BOND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • DocketWAIVER OF PRIORITY, CONSENT TO APPOINTMENT OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE AND WAIVER OF BOND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • DocketOATH OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE, DESIGNATION OF RESIDENT AGENT AND ACCEPTANCE - Recorded (OR 5470.2228 / 20200042697)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • DocketPETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION - Recorded (OR 5470.2224 / 20200042696)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • DocketFORMAL ADMINISTRATION CHECKLIST FOR OPENING ESTATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF HEIRS

    Read MoreRead Less