Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Leon County Courts on 10/06/2020 at 15:18:24 (UTC).

CROOK, RONNY vs MAIORANA, WARDEN C

Case Summary

On 07/30/2020 CROOK, RONNY filed an Other - Writ Of Mandamus lawsuit against MAIORANA, WARDEN C. This case was filed in Leon County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Leon, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are ANGELA DEMPSEY and JOHN COOPER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************1421

  • Filing Date:

    07/30/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Writ Of Mandamus

  • Court:

    Leon County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Leon, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

ANGELA DEMPSEY

JOHN COOPER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CROOK, RONNY

Milton, FL 32583

Defendants

MAIORANA, WARDEN C

Milton, FL 32583

BLACKWATER RIVER CORRECTIONAL FACILITY

Milton, FL 32583

 

Court Documents

APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF CIVIL INDIGENT STATUS (PLAINTIFF MAILED IN THE WRONG APPLICATION AND STILL HAS NOT PROVIDED HIS INMATE TRUST ACCOUNT

9/23/2020: APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF CIVIL INDIGENT STATUS (PLAINTIFF MAILED IN THE WRONG APPLICATION AND STILL HAS NOT PROVIDED HIS INMATE TRUST ACCOUNT

NOTICE OF INQUIRY

9/21/2020: NOTICE OF INQUIRY

NOTICE OF INQUIRY

9/8/2020: NOTICE OF INQUIRY

NOTICE OF INQUIRY

9/8/2020: NOTICE OF INQUIRY

REQUEST FOR DOCUMENTS

9/8/2020: REQUEST FOR DOCUMENTS

LETTER OF RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF MAILED OUT ON 9/8/2020

9/8/2020: LETTER OF RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF MAILED OUT ON 9/8/2020

RETURNED MAIL

9/4/2020: RETURNED MAIL

DOCKET STATEMENT

9/2/2020: DOCKET STATEMENT

AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENCY (WITHOUT INMATE TRUST ACCOUNT)

9/2/2020: AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENCY (WITHOUT INMATE TRUST ACCOUNT)

LETTER OF RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF MAILED OUT ON 8/26/2020

8/26/2020: LETTER OF RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF MAILED OUT ON 8/26/2020

PLAINTIFF REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (SUMMONS CANNOT BE ISSUED UNTIL PLAINTIFF IS DECLARED INDIGENT)

8/21/2020: PLAINTIFF REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (SUMMONS CANNOT BE ISSUED UNTIL PLAINTIFF IS DECLARED INDIGENT)

RESPONSE LETTER TO PETITIONER

8/4/2020: RESPONSE LETTER TO PETITIONER

APPLICATION FOR CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS (NOT DETERMINED - WRONG APPLICATION USED)

7/30/2020: APPLICATION FOR CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS (NOT DETERMINED - WRONG APPLICATION USED)

PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDAMUS

7/30/2020: PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDAMUS

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF CIVIL INDIGENT STATUS (PLAINTIFF MAILED IN THE WRONG APPLICATION AND STILL HAS NOT PROVIDED HIS INMATE TRUST ACCOUNT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF INQUIRY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF INQUIRY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF INQUIRY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DOCUMENTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER OF RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF MAILED OUT ON 9/8/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURNED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDOCKET STATEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENCY (WITHOUT INMATE TRUST ACCOUNT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER OF RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF MAILED OUT ON 8/26/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFF REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (SUMMONS CANNOT BE ISSUED UNTIL PLAINTIFF IS DECLARED INDIGENT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE LETTER TO PETITIONER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • DocketJUDGE COOPER, JOHN C: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • DispositionAction Description: WRIT OF MANDAMUS; Open/Reopen Status: OPEN; Open/Reopen Date: 7/30/2020; Judge: COOPER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPLICATION FOR CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS (NOT DETERMINED - WRONG APPLICATION USED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDAMUS

    Read MoreRead Less