This case was last updated from Leon County Courts on 03/02/2023 at 01:14:50 (UTC).

CORBIN, GLEN ALLEN vs HAND, TARA ELIZABETH

Case Summary

On 12/02/2022 CORBIN, GLEN ALLEN filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against HAND, TARA ELIZABETH. This case was filed in Leon County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Leon, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is ANGELA DEMPSEY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************2110

  • Filing Date:

    12/02/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Leon, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

ANGELA DEMPSEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CORBIN, GLEN ALLEN

Tallahassee, FL 32301

Defendants

HAND, TARA ELIZABETH

Crawfordville, FL 32327

HAND, JAMES CALVIN

Crawfordville, FL 32327

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ANNA R NORRIS

313 N Monroe St., Suite 401, 3133588

Tallahassee, FL 32301

Defendant Attorneys

DAVID M GAGNON

50 North Laura St, Suite 3500 1061787

Jacksonville, FL 32202

PARKER HAILE HASTINGS

50 North Laura Street, Suite 3500, 3269976

Jacksonville, FL 32202

 

Court Documents

DEFENDANTS, TARA HAND AND JAMES HANDS, NOTICE OF SERVING FIRST INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF, GLEN CORBIN

1/31/2023: DEFENDANTS, TARA HAND AND JAMES HANDS, NOTICE OF SERVING FIRST INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF, GLEN CORBIN

DEFENDANTS FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

1/31/2023: DEFENDANTS FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

DEFENDANTS ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT

1/11/2023: DEFENDANTS ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT

DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

1/11/2023: DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

1/11/2023: DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

NOTICE OF FILING RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED - T E HAND

12/9/2022: NOTICE OF FILING RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED - T E HAND

UNIFORM ORDER FOR ACTIVE, DIFFERENTIAL CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT E-NOTICED via email on 2022-12-05

12/5/2022: UNIFORM ORDER FOR ACTIVE, DIFFERENTIAL CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT E-NOTICED via email on 2022-12-05

PAYMENT $420.00 RECEIPT #1678184

12/5/2022: PAYMENT $420.00 RECEIPT #1678184

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

12/2/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

12/2/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

12/2/2022: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

12/2/2022: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

12/2/2022: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

12/2/2022: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

SUMMONS ISSUED

12/2/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

12/2/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED

COMPLAINT

12/2/2022: COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

12/2/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: NSOI; Docket Text: DEFENDANTS, TARA HAND AND JAMES HANDS, NOTICE OF SERVING FIRST INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF, GLEN CORBIN; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: RQPR; Docket Text: DEFENDANTS FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: AAAD; Docket Text: DEFENDANTS ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: NAPR; Docket Text: DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: NAPR; Docket Text: DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: ROSE; Docket Text: NOTICE OF FILING RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED - T E HAND; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: UOCC; Docket Text: UNIFORM ORDER FOR ACTIVE, DIFFERENTIAL CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT E-NOTICED via email on 2022-12-05; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: RECEIPT; Docket Text: PAYMENT $420.00 RECEIPT #1678184; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • DocketDocket Code: a002; Docket Text: JUDGE DEMPSEY, ANGELA C: ASSIGNED; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DispositionAction Description: AUTO NEGLIGENCE; Open/Reopen Status: OPEN; Open/Reopen Date: 12/2/2022; Judge: DEMPSEY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: NSOI; Docket Text: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: NSOI; Docket Text: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: RQPR; Docket Text: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: RQPR; Docket Text: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: RQAD; Docket Text: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: RQAD; Docket Text: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: SUIS; Docket Text: SUMMONS ISSUED; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: SUIS; Docket Text: SUMMONS ISSUED; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: COMP_CA; Docket Text: COMPLAINT; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: CCS; Docket Text: CIVIL COVER SHEET; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less