This case was last updated from Leon County Courts on 03/09/2023 at 05:00:02 (UTC).

CITIBANK N.A. vs FORBES, JESSE J

Case Summary

On 01/10/2023 CITIBANK N A filed an Other lawsuit against FORBES, JESSE J. This case was filed in Leon County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Leon, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is AUGUSTUS AIKENS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************0080

  • Filing Date:

    01/10/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Leon, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

AUGUSTUS AIKENS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CITIBANK, N.A.

Jacksonville, FL 32247

Defendant

FORBES, JESSE J

Tallahassee, FL 32305-6655

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MICHAEL THIEL DEBSKI

P O Box 47718384226

Jacksonville, FL 32247

Defendant Attorney

ERIK ROSSKOPF

301 W Bay Street, Suite 14170, 3038698

Jacksonville, FL 32202

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

1/9/2023: CIVIL COVER SHEET

STATEMENT OF CLAIM/COMPLAINT

1/9/2023: STATEMENT OF CLAIM/COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

1/9/2023: NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

SUMMONS ISSUED

1/9/2023: SUMMONS ISSUED

PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #1684523

1/10/2023: PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #1684523

UNIFORM ORDER FOR ACTIVE, DIFFERENTIAL CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT E-NOTICED via email on 2023-01-10

1/10/2023: UNIFORM ORDER FOR ACTIVE, DIFFERENTIAL CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT E-NOTICED via email on 2023-01-10

DEFENDANTS DEFENSES AND ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT

2/10/2023: DEFENDANTS DEFENSES AND ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT

CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE

2/10/2023: CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE

RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED-J J FORBES

2/20/2023: RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED-J J FORBES

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: ROSE; Docket Text: RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED-J J FORBES; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: CEOS; Docket Text: CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: AAAD; Docket Text: DEFENDANTS DEFENSES AND ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • DispositionAction Description: COUNTY CIVIL OVER $8,000 BUT LESS THAN $15,000; Open/Reopen Status: OPEN; Open/Reopen Date: 1/10/2023 9:04:05 AM; Judge: AIKENS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: UOCC; Docket Text: UNIFORM ORDER FOR ACTIVE, DIFFERENTIAL CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT E-NOTICED via email on 2023-01-10; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: RECEIPT; Docket Text: PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #1684523; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • DocketDocket Code: a002; Docket Text: JUDGE AIKENS, AUGUSTUS D JR: ASSIGNED; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: SUIS; Docket Text: SUMMONS ISSUED; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: NCIF; Docket Text: NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: COCOMP_SC; Docket Text: STATEMENT OF CLAIM/COMPLAINT; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: CCS; Docket Text: CIVIL COVER SHEET; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less