This case was last updated from Leon County Courts on 03/02/2023 at 10:30:03 (UTC).

CITIBANK N A vs PASELA, AMELIA

Case Summary

On 07/01/2021 CITIBANK N A filed an Other lawsuit against PASELA, AMELIA. This case was filed in Leon County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Leon, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is JASON JONES. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************1550

  • Filing Date:

    07/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Leon, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

JASON JONES

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CITIBANK N A

Defendant

PASELA, AMELIA

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

7/1/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

STATEMENT OF CLAIM/COMPLAINT

7/1/2021: STATEMENT OF CLAIM/COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

7/1/2021: NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF LEAD ATTORNEY

7/1/2021: NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF LEAD ATTORNEY

SUMMONS ISSUED

7/1/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED

PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #1579603

7/6/2021: PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #1579603

UNIFORM ORDER FOR ACTIVE, DIFFERENTIAL CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT E-NOTICED via email on 2021-07-06

7/6/2021: UNIFORM ORDER FOR ACTIVE, DIFFERENTIAL CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT E-NOTICED via email on 2021-07-06

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

9/21/2021: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/24/2021
  • DocketDocket Code: DEACTATT; Docket Text: CASE CLOSED 30 DAYS PER RJA 2.505(F) DEACTIVATE ATTORNEY for ATT FLYNN LAVRAR on 10/24/2021; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DispositionDISMISSED BEFORE HEARING; Action Description: COUNTY CIVIL OVER $8,000 BUT LESS THAN $15,000; Open/Reopen Status: CLOS; Open/Reopen Date: 7/1/2021; Judge: JONES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: NVD; Docket Text: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: UOCC; Docket Text: UNIFORM ORDER FOR ACTIVE, DIFFERENTIAL CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT E-NOTICED via email on 2021-07-06; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: RECEIPT; Docket Text: PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #1579603; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketDocket Code: a002; Docket Text: JUDGE JONES, JASON LEE: ASSIGNED; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: SUIS; Docket Text: SUMMONS ISSUED; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: NOTO; Docket Text: NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF LEAD ATTORNEY; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: NCIF; Docket Text: NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: COCOMP_SC; Docket Text: STATEMENT OF CLAIM/COMPLAINT; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: CCS; Docket Text: CIVIL COVER SHEET; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less