This case was last updated from Leon County Courts on 05/27/2020 at 15:20:23 (UTC).

CHAUNCEY, DANIEL vs ROCKNOCKER MUSIC COMPANY INC

Case Summary

On 04/03/2020 CHAUNCEY, DANIEL filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against ROCKNOCKER MUSIC COMPANY INC. This case was filed in Leon County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Leon, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is ANGELA DEMPSEY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************0652

  • Filing Date:

    04/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Leon, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

ANGELA DEMPSEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CHAUNCEY, DANIEL

Miami, FL 33131

Defendants

BARNES, RICHARD DONALD

Marietta, GA 30067

ROCKNOCKER MUSIC COMPANY INC

1201 Hays Street 3094001

Tallahassee, FL 32301

DOES 1-20

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JAMES G SAMMATARO

201 S. Biscayne Boulevard Suite 2700 3094003

Miami, FL 33131

Defendant Attorney

MARTIN SIPPLE

Po Box 3912478925

Tallahassee, FL 32302

 

Court Documents

ORDER GRANTING PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION ON BEHALF OF BARRY MALLEN

5/14/2020: ORDER GRANTING PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION ON BEHALF OF BARRY MALLEN

ORDER GRANTING PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION ON BEHALF OF EDWARD K LEE

5/14/2020: ORDER GRANTING PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION ON BEHALF OF EDWARD K LEE

ORDER

5/14/2020: ORDER

PAYMENT $200.00 RECEIPT #1511081

5/14/2020: PAYMENT $200.00 RECEIPT #1511081

VERIFIED MOTION FOR ADMISSION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE PURSUANT TO FLORIDA RULE OF JUDICIAL ADMINISTRATION 2.510

5/13/2020: VERIFIED MOTION FOR ADMISSION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE PURSUANT TO FLORIDA RULE OF JUDICIAL ADMINISTRATION 2.510

VERIFIED MOTION FOR ADMISSION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE PURSUANT TO FLORIDA RULE OF JUDICIAL ADMINISTRATION 2.510

5/13/2020: VERIFIED MOTION FOR ADMISSION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE PURSUANT TO FLORIDA RULE OF JUDICIAL ADMINISTRATION 2.510

ORDER OF EXTENSION OF TIME

5/13/2020: ORDER OF EXTENSION OF TIME

ENTRY OF APPEARANCE, ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS, AND CONSENT MOTION TO EXTEND RESPONSE DEADLINE

5/8/2020: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE, ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS, AND CONSENT MOTION TO EXTEND RESPONSE DEADLINE

ORDER GRANTING PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION ON BEHALF OF JOHN M GATTI

4/27/2020: ORDER GRANTING PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION ON BEHALF OF JOHN M GATTI

ORDER GRANTING PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION ON BEHALF OF NICHOLAS FRONTERA

4/27/2020: ORDER GRANTING PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION ON BEHALF OF NICHOLAS FRONTERA

PAYMENT $200.00 RECEIPT #1507853

4/20/2020: PAYMENT $200.00 RECEIPT #1507853

VERIFIED MOTION FOR ADMISSION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE PURSUANT TO FLORIDA RULE OF JUDICIAL ADMINISTRATION 2.510

4/16/2020: VERIFIED MOTION FOR ADMISSION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE PURSUANT TO FLORIDA RULE OF JUDICIAL ADMINISTRATION 2.510

VERIFIED MOTION FOR ADMISSION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE PURSUANT TO FLORIDA RULE OF JUDICIAL ADMINISTRATION 2.510

4/16/2020: VERIFIED MOTION FOR ADMISSION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE PURSUANT TO FLORIDA RULE OF JUDICIAL ADMINISTRATION 2.510

PAYMENT $420.00 RECEIPT #1505753

4/3/2020: PAYMENT $420.00 RECEIPT #1505753

SUMMONS ISSUED

4/2/2020: SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

4/2/2020: SUMMONS ISSUED

COMPLAINT

4/2/2020: COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

4/2/2020: CIVIL COVER SHEET

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER GRANTING PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION ON BEHALF OF BARRY MALLEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER GRANTING PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION ON BEHALF OF EDWARD K LEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $200.00 RECEIPT #1511081

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVERIFIED MOTION FOR ADMISSION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE PURSUANT TO FLORIDA RULE OF JUDICIAL ADMINISTRATION 2.510

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVERIFIED MOTION FOR ADMISSION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE PURSUANT TO FLORIDA RULE OF JUDICIAL ADMINISTRATION 2.510

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER OF EXTENSION OF TIME

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketENTRY OF APPEARANCE, ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS, AND CONSENT MOTION TO EXTEND RESPONSE DEADLINE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER GRANTING PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION ON BEHALF OF JOHN M GATTI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER GRANTING PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION ON BEHALF OF NICHOLAS FRONTERA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $200.00 RECEIPT #1507853

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVERIFIED MOTION FOR ADMISSION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE PURSUANT TO FLORIDA RULE OF JUDICIAL ADMINISTRATION 2.510

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVERIFIED MOTION FOR ADMISSION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE PURSUANT TO FLORIDA RULE OF JUDICIAL ADMINISTRATION 2.510

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • DispositionAction Description: CONTRACT; Open/Reopen Status: OPEN; Open/Reopen Date: 4/3/2020; Judge: DEMPSEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $420.00 RECEIPT #1505753

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • DocketJUDGE DEMPSEY, ANGELA C: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Sammataro, James G