This case was last updated from Leon County Courts on 03/02/2023 at 08:27:10 (UTC).

CAVALRY SPV I LLC vs OSBORNE, ROBERT L

Case Summary

On 07/01/2021 CAVALRY SPV I LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against OSBORNE, ROBERT L. This case was filed in Leon County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Leon, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MONIQUE RICHARDSON. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************1368

  • Filing Date:

    07/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Leon, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MONIQUE RICHARDSON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAVALRY SPV I LLC

Defendant

OSBORNE, ROBERT L

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

7/1/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

7/1/2021: STATEMENT OF CLAIM

SUMMONS ISSUED

7/1/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED

NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

7/1/2021: NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #1579374

7/6/2021: PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #1579374

RETURN OF SERVICE UNEXECUTED

8/17/2021: RETURN OF SERVICE UNEXECUTED

PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO CONTINUE PRE-TRIAL HEARING AND TO DIRECT THE CLERK OF COURT TO ISSUE A PLURIES

8/17/2021: PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO CONTINUE PRE-TRIAL HEARING AND TO DIRECT THE CLERK OF COURT TO ISSUE A PLURIES

ORDER TO CONTINUE PRETRIAL HEARING AND TO DIRECT THE CLERK TO ISSUE A PLURIES

8/17/2021: ORDER TO CONTINUE PRETRIAL HEARING AND TO DIRECT THE CLERK TO ISSUE A PLURIES

PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO PERFECT SERVICE

8/18/2022: PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO PERFECT SERVICE

ORDER ON PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO PERFECT SERVICE

8/18/2022: ORDER ON PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO PERFECT SERVICE

ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED

8/25/2022: ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED

PAYMENT $10.00 RECEIPT #1659501

8/26/2022: PAYMENT $10.00 RECEIPT #1659501

RETURN OF SERVICE UNEXECUTED R L OSBORNE

10/11/2022: RETURN OF SERVICE UNEXECUTED R L OSBORNE

COURT MINUTES

10/18/2022: COURT MINUTES

NOTICE OF INTENT TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF SERVICE AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL

12/30/2022: NOTICE OF INTENT TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF SERVICE AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

02/05/2023

DocketDocket Code: DEACTATT; Docket Text: CASE CLOSED 30 DAYS PER RJA 2.505(F) DEACTIVATE ATTORNEY for ATT JEFFREY KAHN on 02/05/2023; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/30/2022

DispositionDISPOSED BY JUDGE; Action Description: SMALL CLAIMS MORE THAN $2500.00 BUT NOT MORE THAN $5000; Open/Reopen Status: CLOS; Open/Reopen Date: 7/1/2021; Judge: RICHARDSON

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/30/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Code: NDOD; Docket Text: NOTICE OF INTENT TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF SERVICE AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/18/2022

HearingEvent: PRETRIAL SC; Start: 9:30 AM; Location: CA1; Judge: RICHARDSON; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/18/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Code: CTCM; Docket Text: COURT MINUTES; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/11/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Code: ROSU; Docket Text: RETURN OF SERVICE UNEXECUTED R L OSBORNE; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/26/2022

DocketDocket Code: a120; Docket Text: PRETRIAL SC SET FOR 10/18/2022 AT 9:30 AM IN CA1, JDG: RICHARDSON, MONIQUE R; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/26/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Code: RECEIPT; Docket Text: PAYMENT $10.00 RECEIPT #1659501; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/25/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Code: SUIS; Docket Text: ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/18/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Code: OEOT; Docket Text: ORDER ON PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO PERFECT SERVICE; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
08/17/2021
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Code: ORGR; Docket Text: ORDER TO CONTINUE PRETRIAL HEARING AND TO DIRECT THE CLERK TO ISSUE A PLURIES; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/17/2021
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Code: MOCO; Docket Text: PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO CONTINUE PRE-TRIAL HEARING AND TO DIRECT THE CLERK OF COURT TO ISSUE A PLURIES; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/17/2021
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Code: ROSU; Docket Text: RETURN OF SERVICE UNEXECUTED; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/06/2021
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Code: RECEIPT; Docket Text: PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #1579374; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/06/2021

DocketDocket Code: a002; Docket Text: JUDGE RICHARDSON, MONIQUE R: ASSIGNED; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/06/2021

DocketDocket Code: a120; Docket Text: PRETRIAL SC SET FOR 08/24/2021 AT 9:30 AM IN CA1, JDG: RICHARDSON, MONIQUE R; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/01/2021
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Code: NCIF; Docket Text: NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/01/2021
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Code: SUIS; Docket Text: SUMMONS ISSUED; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/01/2021
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Code: COCOMP_SC; Docket Text: STATEMENT OF CLAIM; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/01/2021
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Code: CCS; Docket Text: CIVIL COVER SHEET; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less