This case was last updated from Leon County Courts on 08/14/2023 at 01:19:54 (UTC).

APV APARTMENTS LP vs DUNN, EUGENE

Case Summary

On 07/01/2021 APV APARTMENTS LP filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against DUNN, EUGENE. This case was filed in Leon County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Leon, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is AUGUSTUS AIKENS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************1540

  • Filing Date:

    07/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Leon, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

AUGUSTUS AIKENS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

APV APARTMENTS LP

Defendant

DUNN, EUGENE

 

Court Documents

FINAL JUDGMENT - RECORDED (OR 5618.676 / 20210053316)

7/26/2021: FINAL JUDGMENT - RECORDED (OR 5618.676 / 20210053316)

ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS MOTION TO WITHDRAW JUDGMENT AND REINSTATING FINAL JUDGMENT OF EVICTION

9/23/2021: ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS MOTION TO WITHDRAW JUDGMENT AND REINSTATING FINAL JUDGMENT OF EVICTION

ORDER GRANTING CONTINUANCE

8/11/2021: ORDER GRANTING CONTINUANCE

MOTION TO CONTINUE

8/6/2021: MOTION TO CONTINUE

ORDER ON MOTION TO SET ASIDE FINAL JUDGMENT FOR EVICTION AND WRIT OF POSSESSION - RECORDED (OR 5623.2010 / 20210056562)

8/4/2021: ORDER ON MOTION TO SET ASIDE FINAL JUDGMENT FOR EVICTION AND WRIT OF POSSESSION - RECORDED (OR 5623.2010 / 20210056562)

EMERGENCY MOTION REQUEST NEW COURT DATE/ REVERSE RULING/ WITHDRAW JUDGMENT

7/27/2021: EMERGENCY MOTION REQUEST NEW COURT DATE/ REVERSE RULING/ WITHDRAW JUDGMENT

MOTION FOR ORDER DIRECTING CLERK TO ISSUE WRIT OF POSSESSION BASED ON THE PLEADINGS

7/13/2021: MOTION FOR ORDER DIRECTING CLERK TO ISSUE WRIT OF POSSESSION BASED ON THE PLEADINGS

MOTION TO DISMISS EVICTION

7/8/2021: MOTION TO DISMISS EVICTION

COMPLAINT FILED

7/1/2021: COMPLAINT FILED

COURT MINUTES

8/30/2021: COURT MINUTES

COURT MINUTES

8/26/2021: COURT MINUTES

RETURNED MAIL

8/24/2021: RETURNED MAIL

SUBPOENA RETURNED EXECUTED

8/16/2021: SUBPOENA RETURNED EXECUTED

SUBPOENA RETURNED EXECUTED

8/16/2021: SUBPOENA RETURNED EXECUTED

ZOOM COURT INFORMATION SHEET

8/12/2021: ZOOM COURT INFORMATION SHEET

NOTICE OF HEARING

8/12/2021: NOTICE OF HEARING

COURT MINUTES

8/12/2021: COURT MINUTES

NOTICE OF HEARING

8/12/2021: NOTICE OF HEARING

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

10/24/2021

DocketDocket Code: DEACTATT; Docket Text: CASE CLOSED 30 DAYS PER RJA 2.505(F) DEACTIVATE ATTORNEY for ATT ELWIN THRASHER on 10/24/2021; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/23/2021

DispositionDISPOSED; Action Description: REOPENED; Open/Reopen Status: REOPEN; Open/Reopen Date: 7/27/2021; Judge: AIKENS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/23/2021
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Code: ORDE; Docket Text: ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS MOTION TO WITHDRAW JUDGMENT AND REINSTATING FINAL JUDGMENT OF EVICTION; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/30/2021

HearingEvent: LANDLORD TENANT; Start: 8:45 AM; Location: CA1; Judge: AIKENS; Result: HEARING HELD; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/30/2021
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Code: CTCM; Docket Text: COURT MINUTES; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/26/2021

HearingEvent: LANDLORD TENANT; Start: 8:45 AM; Location: CA1; Judge: RICHARDSON; Result: NO ACTION TAKEN; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/26/2021
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Code: CTCM; Docket Text: COURT MINUTES; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/24/2021
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Code: RETM; Docket Text: RETURNED MAIL; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/16/2021
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Code: SUBE; Docket Text: SUBPOENA RETURNED EXECUTED; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/16/2021
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Code: SUBE; Docket Text: SUBPOENA RETURNED EXECUTED; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
27 More Docket Entries
07/14/2021

DocketDocket Code: INFJ; Docket Text: INSTRUCTIONS FROM JUDGE - PER JUDGE AIKENS, PLEASE SET THIS MATTER FOR AN EVICTION HEARING AND NOTICE ALL PARTIES; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/13/2021
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Code: MOFO; Docket Text: MOTION FOR ORDER DIRECTING CLERK TO ISSUE WRIT OF POSSESSION BASED ON THE PLEADINGS; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/12/2021
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Code: CEOM; Docket Text: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/09/2021
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Code: ROSE; Docket Text: RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED - POSTED; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/08/2021
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Code: MTDM; Docket Text: MOTION TO DISMISS EVICTION; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/02/2021
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Code: RECEIPT; Docket Text: PAYMENT $195.00 RECEIPT #1579174; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/02/2021

DocketDocket Code: a002; Docket Text: JUDGE AIKENS, AUGUSTUS D JR: ASSIGNED; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/01/2021
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Code: SUIS; Docket Text: SUMMONS ISSUED; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/01/2021
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Code: LDTN_SC; Docket Text: COMPLAINT FILED; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/01/2021
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Code: CCS; Docket Text: CIVIL COVER SHEET; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less