This case was last updated from Leon County Courts on 03/02/2023 at 10:29:34 (UTC).

THE PRESERVE AT SAN LUIS vs WILKS, DAIJA

Case Summary

On 07/01/2021 THE PRESERVE AT SAN LUIS filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against WILKS, DAIJA. This case was filed in Leon County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Leon, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is AUGUSTUS AIKENS. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************1546

  • Filing Date:

    07/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Leon, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

AUGUSTUS AIKENS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

THE PRESERVE AT SAN LUIS

Defendant

WILKS, DAIJA

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT

7/1/2021: COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

7/1/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

SUMMONS ISSUED

7/2/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED

COPIES MAILED TO TENANT

7/2/2021: COPIES MAILED TO TENANT

PAYMENT $195.00 RECEIPT #1579228

7/2/2021: PAYMENT $195.00 RECEIPT #1579228

RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED- POSTED

7/9/2021: RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED- POSTED

AFFIDAVIT OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE

7/9/2021: AFFIDAVIT OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE

MOTION FOR DEFAULT

7/9/2021: MOTION FOR DEFAULT

MOTION FOR ENTRY OF FINAL JUDGMENT

7/9/2021: MOTION FOR ENTRY OF FINAL JUDGMENT

NOTICE OF FAILURE TO PROSECUTE

5/26/2022: NOTICE OF FAILURE TO PROSECUTE

DISMISSED FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION

8/15/2022: DISMISSED FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION

 

Docket Entries

08/15/2022

DispositionDLOP AFTER HEARING; Action Description: LANDLORD-TENANT RESIDENTIAL; Open/Reopen Status: CLOS; Open/Reopen Date: 7/1/2021; Judge: AIKENS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/15/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Code: DLOP; Docket Text: DISMISSED FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/26/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Code: NFTP; Docket Text: NOTICE OF FAILURE TO PROSECUTE; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/09/2021
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Code: MFFJ; Docket Text: MOTION FOR ENTRY OF FINAL JUDGMENT; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/09/2021
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Code: MODEF; Docket Text: MOTION FOR DEFAULT; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/09/2021
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Code: AFNM; Docket Text: AFFIDAVIT OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/09/2021
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Code: ROSE; Docket Text: RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED- POSTED; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/02/2021
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Code: RECEIPT; Docket Text: PAYMENT $195.00 RECEIPT #1579228; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/02/2021
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Code: CMTT; Docket Text: COPIES MAILED TO TENANT; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/02/2021
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Code: SUIS; Docket Text: SUMMONS ISSUED; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/02/2021

DocketDocket Code: a002; Docket Text: JUDGE AIKENS, AUGUSTUS D JR: ASSIGNED; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/01/2021
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Code: CCS; Docket Text: CIVIL COVER SHEET; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/01/2021
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Code: COMP1_SC; Docket Text: COMPLAINT; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less