This case was last updated from Leon County Courts on 03/02/2023 at 10:29:17 (UTC).

GUY WEIDEMAN MBR FTMH LLC vs HILL, JASON

Case Summary

On 07/01/2021 GUY WEIDEMAN MBR FTMH LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against HILL, JASON. This case was filed in Leon County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Leon, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is STEFANIE NEWLIN. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************1544

  • Filing Date:

    07/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Leon, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

STEFANIE NEWLIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GUY WEIDEMAN MBR FTMH LLC

Defendants

HILL, JASON

BAIN, AMANDA

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT

7/1/2021: COMPLAINT

POWER OF ATTORNEY

7/1/2021: POWER OF ATTORNEY

CIVIL COVER SHEET

7/1/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

SUMMONS ISSUED

7/2/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED

PAYMENT $205.00 RECEIPT #1579214

7/2/2021: PAYMENT $205.00 RECEIPT #1579214

COPIES MAILED TO TENANTS

7/2/2021: COPIES MAILED TO TENANTS

RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED - A BAIN

7/7/2021: RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED - A BAIN

RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED - J HILL

7/7/2021: RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED - J HILL

ANSWER

7/13/2021: ANSWER

NOTICE OF HEARING

7/15/2021: NOTICE OF HEARING

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

7/22/2021: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

COURT MINUTES

7/26/2021: COURT MINUTES

NOTICE OF HEARING

8/6/2021: NOTICE OF HEARING

ZOOM INFORMATION FOR HEARING AND ORDER REQUIRING FILING OF PHONE NUMBER AND EMAIL

8/9/2021: ZOOM INFORMATION FOR HEARING AND ORDER REQUIRING FILING OF PHONE NUMBER AND EMAIL

COURT MINUTES

8/16/2021: COURT MINUTES

NOTICE OF DISMISSAL

8/26/2021: NOTICE OF DISMISSAL

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

09/26/2021

DocketDocket Code: DEACTATT; Docket Text: CASE CLOSED 30 DAYS PER RJA 2.505(F) DEACTIVATE ATTORNEY for ATT FRANK SHAW on 09/26/2021; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/26/2021

DispositionDISMISSED AFTER HEARING; Action Description: LANDLORD-TENANT RESIDENTIAL; Open/Reopen Status: CLOS; Open/Reopen Date: 7/1/2021; Judge: NEWLIN

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/26/2021
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Code: NODM; Docket Text: NOTICE OF DISMISSAL; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/16/2021

HearingEvent: LANDLORD TENANT; Start: 8:45 AM; Location: CA1; Judge: ASHENAFI RICHARDSON; Result: HEARING HELD; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/16/2021
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Code: CTCM; Docket Text: COURT MINUTES; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/09/2021
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Code: ORDR; Docket Text: ZOOM INFORMATION FOR HEARING AND ORDER REQUIRING FILING OF PHONE NUMBER AND EMAIL; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/06/2021

DocketDocket Code: EMAIL; Docket Text: EMAIL SENT TO SHAW, FRANK S IV RE SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT 2021 CC 001544, GUY WEIDEMAN MBR FTMH LLC VS. HILL, JASON WITH 1 ATTACHMENTS: NOH-8/6/2021; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/06/2021
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Code: NOH; Docket Text: NOTICE OF HEARING; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/06/2021

DocketDocket Code: a120; Docket Text: LANDLORD TENANT SET FOR 08/16/2021 AT 8:45 AM IN CA1, JDG: ASHENAFI RICHARDSON, NINA; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/04/2021

DocketDocket Code: INFJ; Docket Text: INSTRUCTIONS FROM JUDGE - PER JUDGE AIKENS, PLEASE SET THIS MATTER FOR AN EVICTION HEARING AND NOTICE ALL PARTIES; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
6 More Docket Entries
07/13/2021
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Code: ANSW; Docket Text: ANSWER; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/07/2021
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Code: ROSE; Docket Text: RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED - J HILL; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/07/2021
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Code: ROSE; Docket Text: RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED - A BAIN; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/02/2021
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Code: CMTT; Docket Text: COPIES MAILED TO TENANTS; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/02/2021
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Code: RECEIPT; Docket Text: PAYMENT $205.00 RECEIPT #1579214; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/02/2021
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Code: SUIS; Docket Text: SUMMONS ISSUED; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/02/2021

DocketDocket Code: a002; Docket Text: JUDGE NEWLIN, STEFANIE M: ASSIGNED; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/01/2021
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Code: CCS; Docket Text: CIVIL COVER SHEET; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/01/2021
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Code: POAT; Docket Text: POWER OF ATTORNEY; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/01/2021
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Code: COMP1_SC; Docket Text: COMPLAINT; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less