This case was last updated from Leon County Courts on 09/23/2023 at 01:52:44 (UTC).

SYSTEM ONE HOLDINGS LLC vs MAXWELL, GHISLAINE

Case Summary

On 05/09/2023 SYSTEM ONE HOLDINGS LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against MAXWELL, GHISLAINE. This case was filed in Leon County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Leon, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is J MARSH. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************1482

  • Filing Date:

    05/09/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Leon, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

J MARSH

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SYSTEM ONE HOLDINGS, LLC

Defendant

MAXWELL, GHISLAINE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RAVI BATTA

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

5/9/2023: CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

5/9/2023: COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ISSUED

5/9/2023: SUMMONS ISSUED

PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #1710465

5/10/2023: PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #1710465

UNIFORM ORDER FOR ACTIVE, DIFFERENTIAL CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT E-NOTICED via email on 2023-05-11

5/11/2023: UNIFORM ORDER FOR ACTIVE, DIFFERENTIAL CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT E-NOTICED via email on 2023-05-11

RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED-GHISLAINE MAXWELL

5/25/2023: RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED-GHISLAINE MAXWELL

RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED-GHISLAINE MAXWELL

6/2/2023: RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED-GHISLAINE MAXWELL

MOTION FOR DEFAULT AND DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT

6/14/2023: MOTION FOR DEFAULT AND DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT

NOTICE OF HEARING

6/15/2023: NOTICE OF HEARING

NOTICE OF FILING - AFFIDAVIT

9/6/2023: NOTICE OF FILING - AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT OF ATTORNEYS FEE

9/8/2023: AFFIDAVIT OF ATTORNEYS FEE

AFFIDAVIT OF COST AND INTEREST

9/8/2023: AFFIDAVIT OF COST AND INTEREST

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: AFFD; Docket Text: AFFIDAVIT OF COST AND INTEREST; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: ADAF; Docket Text: AFFIDAVIT OF ATTORNEYS FEE; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: AFFD; Docket Text: NOTICE OF FILING - AFFIDAVIT; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2023
  • HearingEvent: MOTION HEARING; Start: 11:15 AM; Location: ZOOMC; Judge: MARSH; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/19/2023
  • DocketDocket Code: a120; Docket Text: MOTION HEARING SET FOR 07/18/2023 AT 11:15 AM IN ZOOMC, JDG: MARSH, J LEE; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: NOH; Docket Text: NOTICE OF HEARING; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: MFFJ; Docket Text: MOTION FOR DEFAULT AND DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: ROSE; Docket Text: RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED-GHISLAINE MAXWELL; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: ROSE; Docket Text: RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED-GHISLAINE MAXWELL; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: UOCC; Docket Text: UNIFORM ORDER FOR ACTIVE, DIFFERENTIAL CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT E-NOTICED via email on 2023-05-11; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: RECEIPT; Docket Text: PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #1710465; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2023
  • DocketDocket Code: a002; Docket Text: JUDGE MARSH, J LEE: ASSIGNED; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2023
  • DispositionAction Description: CONTRACT; Open/Reopen Status: OPEN; Open/Reopen Date: 5/9/2023 10:38:07 AM; Judge: MARSH

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: SUIS; Docket Text: SUMMONS ISSUED; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: COMP_CA; Docket Text: COMPLAINT; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: CCS; Docket Text: CIVIL COVER SHEET; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less