This case was last updated from Leon County Courts on 03/02/2023 at 10:28:51 (UTC).

LI, XIANHUA vs CLARK, EDWARD LEWIS II

Case Summary

On 07/01/2021 LI, XIANHUA filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against CLARK, EDWARD LEWIS II. This case was filed in Leon County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Leon, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is NINA ASHENAFI RICHARDSON. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************1541

  • Filing Date:

    07/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Leon, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

NINA ASHENAFI RICHARDSON

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

HUANG, CUI QING

LI, XIANHUA

Defendants

CLARK, EDWARD LEWIS II

UNKNOWN TENANTS

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

7/1/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT FILED

7/1/2021: COMPLAINT FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED

7/1/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

7/1/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

7/1/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

7/1/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED

PAYMENT $225.00 RECEIPT #1579175

7/2/2021: PAYMENT $225.00 RECEIPT #1579175

RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED - POSTED ON UNK TENANTS

7/9/2021: RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED - POSTED ON UNK TENANTS

RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED - POSTED ON E CLARK

7/9/2021: RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED - POSTED ON E CLARK

COPIES MAILED TO TENANT

7/13/2021: COPIES MAILED TO TENANT

COPIES MAILED TO TENANT

7/13/2021: COPIES MAILED TO TENANT

MOTION FOR DEFAULT- ISSUED 7/23/2021

7/21/2021: MOTION FOR DEFAULT- ISSUED 7/23/2021

MOTION FOR ENTRY OF FINAL JUDGMENT

7/26/2021: MOTION FOR ENTRY OF FINAL JUDGMENT

FINAL JUDGMENT FOR EVICTION - Recorded (OR 5623.2267 / 20210056615)

8/4/2021: FINAL JUDGMENT FOR EVICTION - Recorded (OR 5623.2267 / 20210056615)

WRIT OF POSSESSION

8/6/2021: WRIT OF POSSESSION

RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED - POSTED

8/13/2021: RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED - POSTED

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

09/05/2021

DocketDocket Code: DEACTATT; Docket Text: CASE CLOSED 30 DAYS PER RJA 2.505(F) DEACTIVATE ATTORNEY for ATT FRANK SHAW on 09/05/2021; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/05/2021

DocketDocket Code: DEACTATT; Docket Text: CASE CLOSED 30 DAYS PER RJA 2.505(F) DEACTIVATE ATTORNEY for ATT FRANK SHAW on 09/05/2021; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/13/2021
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Code: ROSE; Docket Text: RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED - POSTED; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/06/2021
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Code: WROP; Docket Text: WRIT OF POSSESSION; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/04/2021

DispositionDEFAULT & FINAL JUDGMENT; Action Description: LANDLORD-TENANT RESIDENTIAL; Open/Reopen Status: CLOS; Open/Reopen Date: 7/1/2021; Judge: ASHENAFI RICHARDSON

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/04/2021
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Code: FIJU; Docket Text: FINAL JUDGMENT FOR EVICTION - Recorded (OR 5623.2267 / 20210056615); OR Book: 5623; OR Page: 2267; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/26/2021
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Code: MFFJ; Docket Text: MOTION FOR ENTRY OF FINAL JUDGMENT; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/21/2021
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Code: MODEF; Docket Text: MOTION FOR DEFAULT- ISSUED 7/23/2021; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/13/2021
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Code: CMTT; Docket Text: COPIES MAILED TO TENANT; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/13/2021
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Code: CMTT; Docket Text: COPIES MAILED TO TENANT; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/09/2021
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Code: ROSE; Docket Text: RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED - POSTED ON E CLARK; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/09/2021
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Code: ROSE; Docket Text: RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED - POSTED ON UNK TENANTS; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/02/2021
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Code: RECEIPT; Docket Text: PAYMENT $225.00 RECEIPT #1579175; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/02/2021

DocketDocket Code: a002; Docket Text: JUDGE ASHENAFI RICHARDSON, NINA: ASSIGNED; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/01/2021
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Code: SUIS; Docket Text: SUMMONS ISSUED; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/01/2021
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Code: SUIS; Docket Text: SUMMONS ISSUED; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/01/2021
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Code: SUIS; Docket Text: SUMMONS ISSUED; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/01/2021
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Code: SUIS; Docket Text: SUMMONS ISSUED; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/01/2021
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Code: LDTN_SC; Docket Text: COMPLAINT FILED; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/01/2021
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Code: CCS; Docket Text: CIVIL COVER SHEET; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less