This case was last updated from Leon County - Second Judicial Circuit Court on 11/24/2023 at 01:17:50 (UTC).

CHARLES, LORRAINE vs CITY OF TALLAHASSEE

Case Summary

On 09/06/2023 CHARLES, LORRAINE filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against CITY OF TALLAHASSEE. This case was filed in Leon County - Second Judicial Circuit Court, Leon County Courthouse located in Leon, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is JOHN COOPER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************2196

  • Filing Date:

    09/06/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Leon, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

JOHN COOPER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CHARLES, LORRAINE

Defendant

CITY OF TALLAHASSEE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JOHN FOOTE

Defendant Attorney

JAMES N FLOYD

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

9/6/2023: CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

9/6/2023: COMPLAINT

PAYMENT $400.00 RECEIPT #1734967

9/12/2023: PAYMENT $400.00 RECEIPT #1734967

UNIFORM ORDER FOR ACTIVE, DIFFERENTIAL CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT E-NOTICED via email on 2023-09-12

9/12/2023: UNIFORM ORDER FOR ACTIVE, DIFFERENTIAL CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT E-NOTICED via email on 2023-09-12

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

9/26/2023: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

DEFENDANT, CITY OF TALLAHASSEES FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF

9/26/2023: DEFENDANT, CITY OF TALLAHASSEES FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF

DEFENDANT CITY OF TALLAHASSEES FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO PLAINTIFF

9/26/2023: DEFENDANT CITY OF TALLAHASSEES FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO PLAINTIFF

NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTIES

10/17/2023: NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTIES

PLAINTIFFS REQUEST FOR COPIES

10/19/2023: PLAINTIFFS REQUEST FOR COPIES

 

Docket Entries

10/19/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Code: RQFC; Docket Text: PLAINTIFFS REQUEST FOR COPIES; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/17/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Code: NOPR; Docket Text: NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTIES; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/26/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Code: RQPR; Docket Text: DEFENDANT CITY OF TALLAHASSEES FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO PLAINTIFF; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/26/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Code: NSOI; Docket Text: DEFENDANT, CITY OF TALLAHASSEES FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/26/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Code: AAAD; Docket Text: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/12/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Code: UOCC; Docket Text: UNIFORM ORDER FOR ACTIVE, DIFFERENTIAL CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT E-NOTICED via email on 2023-09-12; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/12/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Code: RECEIPT; Docket Text: PAYMENT $400.00 RECEIPT #1734967; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/12/2023

DocketDocket Code: a002; Docket Text: JUDGE COOPER, JOHN C: ASSIGNED; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/06/2023

DispositionAction Description: NEGLIGENCE PREMISES LIABILITY COMMERCIAL; Open/Reopen Status: OPEN; Open/Reopen Date: 9/6/2023 5:00:35 PM; Judge: COOPER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/06/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Code: COMP_CA; Docket Text: COMPLAINT; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/06/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Code: CCS; Docket Text: CIVIL COVER SHEET; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less