This case was last updated from Leon County Courts on 08/14/2023 at 01:35:23 (UTC).

POWELL, TERRI ELIZABETH vs ADAMS, ROBERT

Case Summary

On 07/01/2021 POWELL, TERRI ELIZABETH filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against ADAMS, ROBERT. This case was filed in Leon County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Leon, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is JASON JONES. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************1545

  • Filing Date:

    07/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Leon, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

JASON JONES

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

POWELL, TERRI ELIZABETH

Defendants

ADAMS, ROBERT

CROLEY, MARJORIE

 

Court Documents

ORDER LIFTING STAY OF WRIT OF POSSESSION

11/10/2021: ORDER LIFTING STAY OF WRIT OF POSSESSION

ORDER STAYING WRIT OF POSSESSION

8/18/2021: ORDER STAYING WRIT OF POSSESSION

EMERGENCY MOTION TO STAY WRIT OF POSSESSION

8/18/2021: EMERGENCY MOTION TO STAY WRIT OF POSSESSION

ORDER DENYING

8/2/2021: ORDER DENYING

EMERGENCY MOTION

7/30/2021: EMERGENCY MOTION

ORDER DENYING

7/30/2021: ORDER DENYING

EMERGENCY MOTION

7/30/2021: EMERGENCY MOTION

FINAL JUDGMENT OF EVICTION - Recorded (OR 5619.1846 / 20210054128)

7/29/2021: FINAL JUDGMENT OF EVICTION - Recorded (OR 5619.1846 / 20210054128)

ANSWER

7/16/2021: ANSWER

RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED

11/23/2021: RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED

COURT MINUTES

11/8/2021: COURT MINUTES

COURT MINUTES

11/1/2021: COURT MINUTES

ZOOM COURT INFORMATION SHEET

11/1/2021: ZOOM COURT INFORMATION SHEET

NOTICE OF HEARING

11/1/2021: NOTICE OF HEARING

NOTICE OF FILING

10/29/2021: NOTICE OF FILING

RETURN OF SERVICE UNEXECUTED - R ADAMS

10/12/2021: RETURN OF SERVICE UNEXECUTED - R ADAMS

COURT MINUTES

10/7/2021: COURT MINUTES

ZOOM COURT INFORMATION SHEET

10/7/2021: ZOOM COURT INFORMATION SHEET

26 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/12/2021
  • DocketDocket Code: DEACTATT; Docket Text: CASE CLOSED 30 DAYS PER RJA 2.505(F) DEACTIVATE ATTORNEY for ATT LAURA WHITEHOUSE on 12/12/2021; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2021
  • DocketDocket Code: DEACTATT; Docket Text: CASE CLOSED 30 DAYS PER RJA 2.505(F) DEACTIVATE ATTORNEY for ATT LAURA WHITEHOUSE on 12/12/2021; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: ROSE; Docket Text: RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: ORDR; Docket Text: ORDER LIFTING STAY OF WRIT OF POSSESSION; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • DispositionDISPOSED; Action Description: REOPENED; Open/Reopen Status: REOPEN; Open/Reopen Date: 8/18/2021; Judge: JONES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • HearingEvent: LANDLORD TENANT; Start: 8:45 AM; Location: CA1; Judge: AIKENS; Result: HEARING HELD; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: CTCM; Docket Text: COURT MINUTES; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • HearingEvent: LANDLORD TENANT; Start: 8:45 AM; Location: CA1; Judge: RICHARDSON; Result: CONTINUED; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: CTCM; Docket Text: COURT MINUTES; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: ZOOMI; Docket Text: ZOOM COURT INFORMATION SHEET; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
45 More Docket Entries
  • 07/21/2021
  • DocketDocket Code: a120; Docket Text: LANDLORD TENANT SET FOR 07/29/2021 AT 8:45 AM IN CA1, JDG: AIKENS, AUGUSTUS D JR; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketDocket Code: INFJ; Docket Text: INSTRUCTIONS FROM JUDGE - PER JUDGE JONES, PLEASE SET THESE 2 CASES ON THE NEXT LANDLORD/TENANT SCHEDULE AND ALLOW FOR MAILING NOTICES; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: ANSW; Docket Text: ANSWER; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: ROSE; Docket Text: RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED - R ADAMS; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: ROSE; Docket Text: RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED - M CROLEY; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: CMTT; Docket Text: COPIES MAILED TO TENANTS; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: RECEIPT; Docket Text: PAYMENT $195.00 RECEIPT #1579225; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: SUIS; Docket Text: SUMMONS ISSUED; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • DocketDocket Code: a002; Docket Text: JUDGE JONES, JASON LEE: ASSIGNED; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: COMP1_SC; Docket Text: COMPLAINT; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less