This case was last updated from Leon County - Second Judicial Circuit Court on 09/07/2023 at 14:01:28 (UTC).

DORIS MALOY AS LEON COUNTY TAX COLLECTOR vs EXTREME CARPET CARE INC

Case Summary

On 05/08/2023 DORIS MALOY AS LEON COUNTY TAX COLLECTOR filed a Contract - Business lawsuit against EXTREME CARPET CARE INC. This case was filed in Leon County - Second Judicial Circuit Court, Leon County Courthouse located in Leon, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is JOHN COOPER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************1490

  • Filing Date:

    05/08/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Business

  • County, State:

    Leon, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

JOHN COOPER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DORIS MALOY AS LEON COUNTY TAX COLLECTOR

Defendants

EXTREME CARPET CARE INC

PARTY CITY CORPORATION 327

SEMINOLE RIDGE ATPS

UNIVERSITY COURTYARD OWNER LLC

HEATH AND RASKY PA

ARCHON DEVELOPMENT CORPORATION

LJC WESTCOTT LLC

HEFFLEY AND ASSOCIATES INC

VILLA SAN MARCO LLC

GUARDIAN LIFE INSURANCE CO OF C/O SUSAN TRAINOR- E

DATAMAXX CAPITAL HOLDING LLC

FASTLANE MART INC

911 DIRECT INC

PRATHAM LLC

TONY KELLY INC HEATING AND AC

OAKSIDE PARK C/O SEAN FERRARI

1 FRESH RESTAURANTS INC C/O WILLIAM POOLE

VALS LAWN CARE INC C/O VALENTIN PELAYO

PREMVALLABH LLC C/O CHIRAG PATEL

389 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TIMOTHY R QUALLS

 

Court Documents

RETURNED MAIL

8/15/2023: RETURNED MAIL

RETURNED MAIL

8/15/2023: RETURNED MAIL

RETURNED MAIL

8/11/2023: RETURNED MAIL

CERTIFIED NOTICE CARD RETURNED

8/10/2023: CERTIFIED NOTICE CARD RETURNED

RETURNED MAIL

8/10/2023: RETURNED MAIL

RETURNED MAIL

8/10/2023: RETURNED MAIL

RETURNED MAIL

8/4/2023: RETURNED MAIL

RETURNED MAIL

8/4/2023: RETURNED MAIL

RETURNED MAIL

8/4/2023: RETURNED MAIL

RETURNED MAIL

8/4/2023: RETURNED MAIL

RETURNED MAIL

8/4/2023: RETURNED MAIL

CERTIFIED NOTICE CARD RETURNED

8/4/2023: CERTIFIED NOTICE CARD RETURNED

CERTIFIED NOTICE CARD RETURNED

8/4/2023: CERTIFIED NOTICE CARD RETURNED

PAYMENT $2,511.00 RECEIPT #1727019

8/2/2023: PAYMENT $2,511.00 RECEIPT #1727019

RETURNED MAIL

7/21/2023: RETURNED MAIL

RETURNED MAIL

7/21/2023: RETURNED MAIL

RETURNED MAIL

7/21/2023: RETURNED MAIL

RETURNED MAIL

7/20/2023: RETURNED MAIL

236 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

09/07/2023

HearingEvent: HEARING; Start: 1:00 PM; Location: ZOOMC; Judge: COOPER; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/15/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Code: RETM; Docket Text: RETURNED MAIL; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/15/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Code: RETM; Docket Text: RETURNED MAIL; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/11/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Code: RETM; Docket Text: RETURNED MAIL; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/10/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Code: CNCR; Docket Text: CERTIFIED NOTICE CARD RETURNED; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/10/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Code: RETM; Docket Text: RETURNED MAIL; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/10/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Code: RETM; Docket Text: RETURNED MAIL; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/04/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Code: RETM; Docket Text: RETURNED MAIL; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/04/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Code: RETM; Docket Text: RETURNED MAIL; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/04/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Code: RETM; Docket Text: RETURNED MAIL; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
237 More Docket Entries
06/06/2023

DocketDocket Code: a120; Docket Text: HEARING SET FOR 09/07/2023 AT 1:00 PM IN ZOOMC, JDG: COOPER, JOHN C; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/02/2023

DocketDocket Code: EMAIL; Docket Text: EMAIL SENT TO MS. STANLEY RE SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT 2023 CA 001490, DORIS MALOY AS LEON COUNTY TAX COLLECTOR VS. EXTREME CARPET CARE INC WITH 1 ATTACHMENTS: NOAC-6/2/2023; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/02/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Code: NOAC; Docket Text: NOTICE OF ACTION; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/12/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Code: RECEIPT; Docket Text: RECEIPT # 1710589 MODIFIED: PAYMENT $1,432.50; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/11/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Code: UOCC; Docket Text: UNIFORM ORDER FOR ACTIVE, DIFFERENTIAL CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT E-NOTICED via email on 2023-05-11; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/10/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Code: RECEIPT; Docket Text: PAYMENT $402.50 REFUND $1,030.00 RECEIPT #1710589; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/10/2023

DocketDocket Code: a002; Docket Text: JUDGE COOPER, JOHN C: ASSIGNED; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/08/2023

DispositionAction Description: OTHER BUSINESS TRANSACTIONS; Open/Reopen Status: OPEN; Open/Reopen Date: 5/8/2023; Judge: COOPER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/08/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Code: COMP_CA; Docket Text: COMPLAINT; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/08/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Code: CCS; Docket Text: CIVIL COVER SHEET; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less