This case was last updated from Leon County Courts on 09/27/2023 at 04:30:10 (UTC).

DIXON ANDERSON, TERRI vs TALLAHASSEE MEMORIAL HEALTHCARE INC

Case Summary

On 03/21/2023 DIXON ANDERSON, TERRI filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against TALLAHASSEE MEMORIAL HEALTHCARE INC. This case was filed in Leon County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Leon, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is J MARSH. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************0832

  • Filing Date:

    03/21/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Leon, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

J MARSH

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DIXON ANDERSON, TERRI

Defendant

TALLAHASSEE MEMORIAL HEALTHCARE, INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JOHN FOOTE

Defendant Attorneys

CHASE EDWARD BOSWELL

MICHAEL J THOMAS

JACLYN E JONES

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

3/21/2023: CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

3/21/2023: COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ISSUED

3/21/2023: SUMMONS ISSUED

PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #1700619

3/24/2023: PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #1700619

UNIFORM ORDER FOR ACTIVE, DIFFERENTIAL CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT E-NOTICED via email on 2023-03-24

3/24/2023: UNIFORM ORDER FOR ACTIVE, DIFFERENTIAL CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT E-NOTICED via email on 2023-03-24

RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED-JUDY DAVIS RISK MANAGER

7/17/2023: RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED-JUDY DAVIS RISK MANAGER

DEFENDANT TMHS ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

7/31/2023: DEFENDANT TMHS ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES

7/31/2023: DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES

DEFENDANT, TALLAHASSEE MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, INC.S, FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

7/31/2023: DEFENDANT, TALLAHASSEE MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, INC.S, FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

DEFENDANT, TALLAHASSEE MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, INC.S, NOTICE OF SERVICE OF FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF

7/31/2023: DEFENDANT, TALLAHASSEE MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, INC.S, NOTICE OF SERVICE OF FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF

PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

9/18/2023: PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

PLAINTIFFS RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE

9/18/2023: PLAINTIFFS RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: RDD; Docket Text: PLAINTIFFS RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: NOTO; Docket Text: PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: NSOI; Docket Text: DEFENDANT, TALLAHASSEE MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, INC.S, NOTICE OF SERVICE OF FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: RQPR; Docket Text: DEFENDANT, TALLAHASSEE MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, INC.S, FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: NAPR; Docket Text: DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: AAAD; Docket Text: DEFENDANT TMHS ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: ROSE; Docket Text: RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED-JUDY DAVIS RISK MANAGER; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: UOCC; Docket Text: UNIFORM ORDER FOR ACTIVE, DIFFERENTIAL CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT E-NOTICED via email on 2023-03-24; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: RECEIPT; Docket Text: PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #1700619; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/24/2023
  • DocketDocket Code: a002; Docket Text: JUDGE MARSH, J LEE: ASSIGNED; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2023
  • DispositionAction Description: NEGLIGENCE PREMISES LIABILITY COMMERCIAL; Open/Reopen Status: OPEN; Open/Reopen Date: 3/21/2023; Judge: MARSH

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: SUIS; Docket Text: SUMMONS ISSUED; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: COMP_CA; Docket Text: COMPLAINT; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: CCS; Docket Text: CIVIL COVER SHEET; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less