*************1551
07/01/2021
Pending - Other Pending
Property - Residential Eviction
Not Classified By Court
Leon, Florida
STEFANIE NEWLIN
PARADIGM PROPERTIES MANAGEMENT TEAM INC
EDWARDS, DANIELLE
8/25/2022: ORDER ON DAMAGES
7/7/2022: ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO APPEAR
6/22/2022: MOTION TO APPEAR DENIED REHEARING
6/17/2022: ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR REHEARING
6/15/2022: MOTION FOR REHEARING
9/8/2021: CONDITIONAL JUDGMENT OF EVICTION
7/23/2021: ORDER GRANTING
7/14/2021: ANSWER- FILED BY NON PARTY
7/14/2021: ANSWER
7/19/2022: COURT MINUTES
7/18/2022: EXHIBITS
7/8/2022: NOTICE OF HEARING
6/14/2022: COURT MINUTES
4/8/2022: NOTICE OF HEARING
8/5/2021: COURT MINUTES
7/26/2021: NOTICE OF HEARING
7/21/2021: REQUEST TO POSTPONE HEARING
7/16/2021: NOTICE OF HEARING
DocketDocket Code: DEACTATT; Docket Text: CASE CLOSED 30 DAYS PER RJA 2.505(F) DEACTIVATE ATTORNEY for ATT ELWIN THRASHER on 09/25/2022; Source: BM
[-] Read LessDispositionDISPOSED; Action Description: REOPENED; Open/Reopen Status: REOPEN; Open/Reopen Date: 6/22/2022; Judge: NEWLIN
[-] Read LessDocketDocket Code: ORDR; Docket Text: ORDER ON DAMAGES; Source: BM
[-] Read LessDocketDocket Code: CTCM; Docket Text: COURT MINUTES; Source: BM
[-] Read LessHearingEvent: HEARING; Start: 4:00 PM; Location: CA1; Judge: NEWLIN; Source: BM
[-] Read LessDocketDocket Code: EX; Docket Text: EXHIBITS; Source: BM
[-] Read LessDocketDocket Code: EMAIL; Docket Text: EMAIL SENT TO THRASHER, ELWIN R III; EDWARDS, DANIELLE RE SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT 2021 CC 001551, PARADIGM PROPERTIES MANAGEMENT TEAM INC VS. EDWARDS, DANIELLE WITH 1 ATTACHMENTS: NOH-7/8/2022; Source: BM
[-] Read LessDocketDocket Code: NOH; Docket Text: NOTICE OF HEARING; Source: BM
[-] Read LessDocketDocket Code: a120; Docket Text: HEARING SET FOR 07/18/2022 AT 4:00 PM IN CA1, JDG: NEWLIN, STEFANIE M; Source: BM
[-] Read LessDocketDocket Code: INFJ; Docket Text: INSTRUCTIONS FROM JUDGE - PER JUDGE NEWLIN, PLEASE SET THIS CASE FOR HEARING 7/18/2022 AT 4 PM AND NOTICE ALL PARTIES; Source: BM
[-] Read LessDocketDocket Code: INFJ; Docket Text: INSTRUCTIONS FROM JUDGE - PLEASE SET ON THE NEXT AVAILABLE EVICTION DOCKET AND NOTICE ALL PARTIES - TENANT FILED ANSWER; Source: BM
[-] Read LessDocketDocket Code: ANSW; Docket Text: ANSWER- FILED BY NON PARTY; Source: BM
[-] Read LessDocketDocket Code: ANSW; Docket Text: ANSWER; Source: BM
[-] Read LessDocketDocket Code: ROSE; Docket Text: RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED- POSTED; Source: BM
[-] Read LessDocketDocket Code: CMTT; Docket Text: COPIES MAILED TO TENANT; Source: BM
[-] Read LessDocketDocket Code: RECEIPT; Docket Text: PAYMENT $195.00 RECEIPT #1579618; Source: BM
[-] Read LessDocketDocket Code: a002; Docket Text: JUDGE NEWLIN, STEFANIE M: ASSIGNED; Source: BM
[-] Read LessDocketDocket Code: SUIS; Docket Text: SUMMONS ISSUED; Source: BM
[-] Read LessDocketDocket Code: LDTN_SC; Docket Text: COMPLAINT FILED; Source: BM
[-] Read LessDocketDocket Code: CCS; Docket Text: CIVIL COVER SHEET; Source: BM
[-] Read Less