This case was last updated from Leon County Courts on 08/14/2023 at 01:07:46 (UTC).

PARADIGM PROPERTIES MANAGEMENT TEAM INC vs EDWARDS, DANIELLE

Case Summary

On 07/01/2021 PARADIGM PROPERTIES MANAGEMENT TEAM INC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against EDWARDS, DANIELLE. This case was filed in Leon County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Leon, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is STEFANIE NEWLIN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************1551

  • Filing Date:

    07/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Leon, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

STEFANIE NEWLIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PARADIGM PROPERTIES MANAGEMENT TEAM INC

Defendant

EDWARDS, DANIELLE

 

Court Documents

ORDER ON DAMAGES

8/25/2022: ORDER ON DAMAGES

ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO APPEAR

7/7/2022: ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO APPEAR

MOTION TO APPEAR DENIED REHEARING

6/22/2022: MOTION TO APPEAR DENIED REHEARING

ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR REHEARING

6/17/2022: ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR REHEARING

MOTION FOR REHEARING

6/15/2022: MOTION FOR REHEARING

CONDITIONAL JUDGMENT OF EVICTION

9/8/2021: CONDITIONAL JUDGMENT OF EVICTION

ORDER GRANTING

7/23/2021: ORDER GRANTING

ANSWER- FILED BY NON PARTY

7/14/2021: ANSWER- FILED BY NON PARTY

ANSWER

7/14/2021: ANSWER

COURT MINUTES

7/19/2022: COURT MINUTES

EXHIBITS

7/18/2022: EXHIBITS

NOTICE OF HEARING

7/8/2022: NOTICE OF HEARING

COURT MINUTES

6/14/2022: COURT MINUTES

NOTICE OF HEARING

4/8/2022: NOTICE OF HEARING

COURT MINUTES

8/5/2021: COURT MINUTES

NOTICE OF HEARING

7/26/2021: NOTICE OF HEARING

REQUEST TO POSTPONE HEARING

7/21/2021: REQUEST TO POSTPONE HEARING

NOTICE OF HEARING

7/16/2021: NOTICE OF HEARING

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

09/25/2022

DocketDocket Code: DEACTATT; Docket Text: CASE CLOSED 30 DAYS PER RJA 2.505(F) DEACTIVATE ATTORNEY for ATT ELWIN THRASHER on 09/25/2022; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/25/2022

DispositionDISPOSED; Action Description: REOPENED; Open/Reopen Status: REOPEN; Open/Reopen Date: 6/22/2022; Judge: NEWLIN

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/25/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Code: ORDR; Docket Text: ORDER ON DAMAGES; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/19/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Code: CTCM; Docket Text: COURT MINUTES; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/18/2022

HearingEvent: HEARING; Start: 4:00 PM; Location: CA1; Judge: NEWLIN; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/18/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Code: EX; Docket Text: EXHIBITS; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/08/2022

DocketDocket Code: EMAIL; Docket Text: EMAIL SENT TO THRASHER, ELWIN R III; EDWARDS, DANIELLE RE SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT 2021 CC 001551, PARADIGM PROPERTIES MANAGEMENT TEAM INC VS. EDWARDS, DANIELLE WITH 1 ATTACHMENTS: NOH-7/8/2022; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/08/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Code: NOH; Docket Text: NOTICE OF HEARING; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/08/2022

DocketDocket Code: a120; Docket Text: HEARING SET FOR 07/18/2022 AT 4:00 PM IN CA1, JDG: NEWLIN, STEFANIE M; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/07/2022

DocketDocket Code: INFJ; Docket Text: INSTRUCTIONS FROM JUDGE - PER JUDGE NEWLIN, PLEASE SET THIS CASE FOR HEARING 7/18/2022 AT 4 PM AND NOTICE ALL PARTIES; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
24 More Docket Entries
07/15/2021

DocketDocket Code: INFJ; Docket Text: INSTRUCTIONS FROM JUDGE - PLEASE SET ON THE NEXT AVAILABLE EVICTION DOCKET AND NOTICE ALL PARTIES - TENANT FILED ANSWER; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/14/2021
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Code: ANSW; Docket Text: ANSWER- FILED BY NON PARTY; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/14/2021
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Code: ANSW; Docket Text: ANSWER; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/12/2021
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Code: ROSE; Docket Text: RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED- POSTED; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/09/2021
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Code: CMTT; Docket Text: COPIES MAILED TO TENANT; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/06/2021
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Code: RECEIPT; Docket Text: PAYMENT $195.00 RECEIPT #1579618; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/06/2021

DocketDocket Code: a002; Docket Text: JUDGE NEWLIN, STEFANIE M: ASSIGNED; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/01/2021
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Code: SUIS; Docket Text: SUMMONS ISSUED; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/01/2021
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Code: LDTN_SC; Docket Text: COMPLAINT FILED; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/01/2021
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Code: CCS; Docket Text: CIVIL COVER SHEET; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less