This case was last updated from Leon County Courts on 03/02/2023 at 10:28:19 (UTC).

ELITE REAL ESTATE INVESTMENTS OF NORTH FLORIDA LLC vs HAYES, KAMONA

Case Summary

On 07/01/2021 ELITE REAL ESTATE INVESTMENTS OF NORTH FLORIDA LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against HAYES, KAMONA. This case was filed in Leon County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Leon, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is JASON JONES. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************1538

  • Filing Date:

    07/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Leon, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

JASON JONES

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ELITE REAL ESTATE INVESTMENTS OF NORTH FLORIDA LLC

Defendant

HAYES, KAMONA

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

6/30/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT FILED

6/30/2021: COMPLAINT FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED

6/30/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED

PAYMENT $195.00 RECEIPT #1579161

7/2/2021: PAYMENT $195.00 RECEIPT #1579161

EMERGENCY MOTION TO STAY EVICTION

7/2/2021: EMERGENCY MOTION TO STAY EVICTION

RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED - POSTED

7/8/2021: RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED - POSTED

COPIES MAILED TO TENANT

7/12/2021: COPIES MAILED TO TENANT

NOTICE OF HEARING

7/15/2021: NOTICE OF HEARING

COURT MINUTES

7/26/2021: COURT MINUTES

WRIT OF POSSESSION

7/26/2021: WRIT OF POSSESSION

FINAL JUDGMENT - Recorded (OR 5618.692 / 20210053324)

7/26/2021: FINAL JUDGMENT - Recorded (OR 5618.692 / 20210053324)

RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED

7/29/2021: RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/13/2022
  • DocketDocket Code: DEACTATT; Docket Text: CASE CLOSED 30 DAYS PER RJA 2.505(F) DEACTIVATE ATTORNEY for ATT ELWIN THRASHER on 03/13/2022; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: ROSE; Docket Text: RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • HearingEvent: LANDLORD TENANT; Start: 8:45 AM; Location: CA1; Judge: AIKENS; Result: HEARING HELD; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • DispositionDISPOSED BY JUDGE; Action Description: LANDLORD-TENANT RESIDENTIAL; Open/Reopen Status: CLOS; Open/Reopen Date: 7/1/2021; Judge: AIKENS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: FIJU; Docket Text: FINAL JUDGMENT - Recorded (OR 5618.692 / 20210053324); OR Book: 5618; OR Page: 692; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: WROP; Docket Text: WRIT OF POSSESSION; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: CTCM; Docket Text: COURT MINUTES; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketDocket Code: EMAIL; Docket Text: EMAIL SENT TO THRASHER, ELWIN R III RE SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT 2021 CC 001538, ELITE REAL ESTATE INVESTMENTS OF NORTH FLORIDA LLC VS. HAYES, KAMONA WITH 1 ATTACHMENTS: NOH-7/15/2021; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: NOH; Docket Text: NOTICE OF HEARING; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketDocket Code: a120; Docket Text: LANDLORD TENANT SET FOR 07/26/2021 AT 8:45 AM IN CA1, JDG: AIKENS, AUGUSTUS D JR; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketDocket Code: INFJ; Docket Text: INSTRUCTIONS FROM JUDGE - PER JUDGE JONES, PLEASE SET THIS CASE ON THE NEXT AVAILABLE LANDLORD/TENANT SCHEDULE TO ALLOW FOR MAILING NOTICE; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: CMTT; Docket Text: COPIES MAILED TO TENANT; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: ROSE; Docket Text: RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED - POSTED; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • DocketDocket Code: EMAIL; Docket Text: EMAIL SENT TO JUDGE JONES RE SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT 2021 CC 001538, ELITE REAL ESTATE INVESTMENTS OF NORTH FLORIDA LLC VS. HAYES, KAMONA WITH 1 ATTACHMENTS: EM-7/2/2021; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: EM; Docket Text: EMERGENCY MOTION TO STAY EVICTION; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: RECEIPT; Docket Text: PAYMENT $195.00 RECEIPT #1579161; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • DocketDocket Code: a002; Docket Text: JUDGE JONES, JASON LEE: ASSIGNED; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: SUIS; Docket Text: SUMMONS ISSUED; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: LDTN_SC; Docket Text: COMPLAINT FILED; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: CCS; Docket Text: CIVIL COVER SHEET; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less