This case was last updated from Leon County Courts on 10/20/2023 at 02:00:28 (UTC).

TAYLOR, BRETT vs CITY OF TALLAHASSEE

Case Summary

On 08/18/2023 TAYLOR, BRETT filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against CITY OF TALLAHASSEE. This case was filed in Leon County Courts, Leon County Courthouse located in Leon, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is JOHN COOPER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************2089

  • Filing Date:

    08/18/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Leon, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

JOHN COOPER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TAYLOR, BRETT

Defendant

CITY OF TALLAHASSEE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JOHN FOOTE

Defendant Attorney

KATHRYN L HOOD

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

8/18/2023: CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

8/18/2023: COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

8/18/2023: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

8/18/2023: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

SUMMONS ISSUED

8/18/2023: SUMMONS ISSUED

PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #1730845

8/21/2023: PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #1730845

UNIFORM ORDER FOR ACTIVE, DIFFERENTIAL CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT E-NOTICED via email on 2023-08-21

8/21/2023: UNIFORM ORDER FOR ACTIVE, DIFFERENTIAL CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT E-NOTICED via email on 2023-08-21

RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED-CITY OF TALLAHASSEE

9/5/2023: RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED-CITY OF TALLAHASSEE

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

10/4/2023: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

DEFENDANT, CITY OF TALLAHASSEES FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF

10/9/2023: DEFENDANT, CITY OF TALLAHASSEES FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF

DEFENDANT CITY OF TALLAHASSEES FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO PLAINTIFF

10/9/2023: DEFENDANT CITY OF TALLAHASSEES FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO PLAINTIFF

CITY OF TALLAHASSEES RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS

10/9/2023: CITY OF TALLAHASSEES RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF DEFENDANT, CITY OF TALLAHASSEES, VERIFIED ANSWERS TO PLAINTIFFS FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES

10/10/2023: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF DEFENDANT, CITY OF TALLAHASSEES, VERIFIED ANSWERS TO PLAINTIFFS FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

10/10/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Code: NSOI; Docket Text: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF DEFENDANT, CITY OF TALLAHASSEES, VERIFIED ANSWERS TO PLAINTIFFS FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/09/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Code: RDD; Docket Text: CITY OF TALLAHASSEES RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/09/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Code: RQPR; Docket Text: DEFENDANT CITY OF TALLAHASSEES FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO PLAINTIFF; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/09/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Code: NSOI; Docket Text: DEFENDANT, CITY OF TALLAHASSEES FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/04/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Code: AAAD; Docket Text: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/05/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Code: ROSE; Docket Text: RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED-CITY OF TALLAHASSEE; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/21/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Code: UOCC; Docket Text: UNIFORM ORDER FOR ACTIVE, DIFFERENTIAL CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT E-NOTICED via email on 2023-08-21; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/21/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Code: RECEIPT; Docket Text: PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #1730845; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/21/2023

DocketDocket Code: a002; Docket Text: JUDGE COOPER, JOHN C: ASSIGNED; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/18/2023

DispositionAction Description: NEGLIGENCE PREMISES LIABILITY COMMERCIAL; Open/Reopen Status: OPEN; Open/Reopen Date: 8/18/2023 4:48:49 PM; Judge: COOPER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/18/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Code: SUIS; Docket Text: SUMMONS ISSUED; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/18/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Code: RQPR; Docket Text: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/18/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Code: NSOI; Docket Text: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/18/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Code: COMP_CA; Docket Text: COMPLAINT; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/18/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Code: CCS; Docket Text: CIVIL COVER SHEET; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less