This case was last updated from Leon County Courts on 03/13/2023 at 01:18:38 (UTC).

CAMPUS USA CREDIT UNION vs COPPEDGE, DAVID B

Case Summary

On 12/19/2022 CAMPUS USA CREDIT UNION filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against COPPEDGE, DAVID B. This case was filed in Leon County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Leon, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MONIQUE RICHARDSON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************2385

  • Filing Date:

    12/19/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Leon, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MONIQUE RICHARDSON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAMPUS USA CREDIT UNION

P.O. Box 550858, 3266045

Jacksonville, FL 32255-0850

Defendant

COPPEDGE, DAVID B

Tallahassee, FL 32309-6870

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

JENNIFER L REISS

Hiday And Ricke Pa, P O Box 550858 1819924

Jacksonville, FL 32255

LINDA JOANNA FRESNEDA-LLERENA

Po Box 550858, 3105785

Jacksonville, FL 32255

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

12/19/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

STATEMENT OF CLAIM/COMPLAINT

12/19/2022: STATEMENT OF CLAIM/COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ISSUED

12/19/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED

DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND EMAIL ADDRESS

12/19/2022: DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND EMAIL ADDRESS

PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #1681041

12/19/2022: PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #1681041

PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR TELEPHONIC HEARING

12/28/2022: PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR TELEPHONIC HEARING

ORDER ALLOWING PLAINTIFF TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE

1/5/2023: ORDER ALLOWING PLAINTIFF TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE

PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO CANCEL PRETRIAL

1/25/2023: PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO CANCEL PRETRIAL

RETURN OF SERVICE UNEXECUTED-D B COPPEDGE

1/27/2023: RETURN OF SERVICE UNEXECUTED-D B COPPEDGE

RETURN OF SERVICE UNEXECUTED-DAVID B COPPEDGE

1/27/2023: RETURN OF SERVICE UNEXECUTED-DAVID B COPPEDGE

ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO CANCEL PRETRIAL

1/30/2023: ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO CANCEL PRETRIAL

COURT MINUTES

2/9/2023: COURT MINUTES

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: CTCM; Docket Text: COURT MINUTES; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • HearingEvent: PRETRIAL SC; Start: 9:30 AM; Location: CA1; Judge: RICHARDSON; Result: CANCELLED; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: ORGR; Docket Text: ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO CANCEL PRETRIAL; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: ROSU; Docket Text: RETURN OF SERVICE UNEXECUTED-DAVID B COPPEDGE; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: ROSU; Docket Text: RETURN OF SERVICE UNEXECUTED-D B COPPEDGE; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: MOTO; Docket Text: PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO CANCEL PRETRIAL; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: OGTH; Docket Text: ORDER ALLOWING PLAINTIFF TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: MFTH; Docket Text: PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR TELEPHONIC HEARING; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • DispositionAction Description: SMALL CLAIMS MORE THAN $5,000 BUT NOT MORE THAN $8000; Open/Reopen Status: OPEN; Open/Reopen Date: 12/19/2022; Judge: RICHARDSON

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: RECEIPT; Docket Text: PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #1681041; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: DOEA; Docket Text: HIDAY $RICKE, P.A.S DESIGNATION OF PRIMARY E-MAIL ADDRESS; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: SUIS; Docket Text: SUMMONS ISSUED; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: COCOMP_SC; Docket Text: STATEMENT OF CLAIM/COMPLAINT; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: CCS; Docket Text: CIVIL COVER SHEET; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • DocketDocket Code: a002; Docket Text: JUDGE RICHARDSON, MONIQUE R: ASSIGNED; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • DocketDocket Code: a120; Docket Text: PRETRIAL SC SET FOR 01/31/2023 AT 9:30 AM IN CA1, JDG: RICHARDSON, MONIQUE R; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less