Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Leon County Courts on 10/05/2020 at 06:08:59 (UTC).

BUTLER, DEBBIE J vs HALL, ERIC SEAN

Case Summary

On 06/29/2020 BUTLER, DEBBIE J filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against HALL, ERIC SEAN. This case was filed in Leon County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Leon, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is JOHN COOPER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************1215

  • Filing Date:

    06/29/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Leon County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Leon, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

JOHN COOPER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BUTLER, DEBBIE J

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33319

Defendants

HALL, ERIC SEAN

Tallahassee, FL 32308

UBER TECHNOLOGIES INC A DELAWARE CORPORATION

1200 South Pine Island Road 3103283

Plantation, FL 33324

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LATOYA HARRIDON-LODGE

3500 N State Road 7 Suite 207 3103284

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33319

Defendant Attorneys

ROBERT JASON SQUIRE

6750 North Andrews Ave Suite 200 3108727

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33309

DANIEL P MADDEN

6750 North Andrews Ave Suite 200 3108728

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33309

KATHRYN M OUGHTON

201 N. Hogan Street Suite 400 2934891

Jacksonville, FL 32202

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

9/30/2020: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND EMAIL ADDRESS

9/28/2020: DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND EMAIL ADDRESS

DEFENDANT UBER TECHNOLOGIES, INC.S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS INITIAL REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

8/24/2020: DEFENDANT UBER TECHNOLOGIES, INC.S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS INITIAL REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

DEFENDANT UBER TECHNOLOGIES, INC.S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

8/24/2020: DEFENDANT UBER TECHNOLOGIES, INC.S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

DEFENDANT UBER TEHCNOLOGIES, INC.S NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO PLAINTIFFS INITIAL INTERROGATORIES

8/24/2020: DEFENDANT UBER TEHCNOLOGIES, INC.S NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO PLAINTIFFS INITIAL INTERROGATORIES

DEFENDANT, ERIC SEAN HALLS INITIAL REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO PLAINTIFF, DEBBIE JAMES BUTLER

8/19/2020: DEFENDANT, ERIC SEAN HALLS INITIAL REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO PLAINTIFF, DEBBIE JAMES BUTLER

DEFENDANT, ERIC SEAN HALL NOTICE OF SERVING FIRST SETOF INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF, DEBBIE JAMES BUTLER

8/19/2020: DEFENDANT, ERIC SEAN HALL NOTICE OF SERVING FIRST SETOF INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF, DEBBIE JAMES BUTLER

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

8/4/2020: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FILED

8/4/2020: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FILED

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

6/27/2020: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

6/27/2020: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

6/27/2020: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

6/27/2020: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

6/27/2020: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

6/27/2020: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

SUMMONS ISSUED

6/27/2020: SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

6/27/2020: SUMMONS ISSUED

CIVIL COVER SHEET

6/27/2020: CIVIL COVER SHEET

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND EMAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANT UBER TECHNOLOGIES, INC.S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS INITIAL REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANT UBER TECHNOLOGIES, INC.S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANT UBER TEHCNOLOGIES, INC.S NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO PLAINTIFFS INITIAL INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANT, ERIC SEAN HALLS INITIAL REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO PLAINTIFF, DEBBIE JAMES BUTLER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANT, ERIC SEAN HALL NOTICE OF SERVING FIRST SETOF INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF, DEBBIE JAMES BUTLER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANT, UBER TECHNOLOGIES, INC.S MOTION TO DISMISS, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION FOR MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 06/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where UBER TECHNOLOGIES INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Latoya Harridon-Lodge Esq