This case was last updated from Leon County - Second Judicial Circuit Court on 11/13/2023 at 01:34:02 (UTC).

BROWN, ANTONIO vs CITY OF TALLAHASSEE

Case Summary

On 09/25/2020 BROWN, ANTONIO filed an Other lawsuit against CITY OF TALLAHASSEE. This case was filed in Leon County - Second Judicial Circuit Court, Leon County Courthouse located in Leon, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are CHARLES DODSON, J SMITH and J MARSH. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************1787

  • Filing Date:

    09/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Leon, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

CHARLES DODSON

J SMITH

J MARSH

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BROWN, ANTONIO

JACKSON, JENNIFER

Defendant

CITY OF TALLAHASSEE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

IMANI JERE WATERS

CHARLES GEE

Defendant Attorneys

MIRIAM R COLES

J STEVEN CARTER

 

Court Documents

ANSWER, DEFENSES, AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO PLAINTIFFS THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT

7/11/2022: ANSWER, DEFENSES, AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO PLAINTIFFS THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT

THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT

6/21/2022: THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT

ORDER DENYING IN PART AND GRANTING IN PART DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT

6/15/2022: ORDER DENYING IN PART AND GRANTING IN PART DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT

PLAINTIFFS CASE LAW IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

6/3/2022: PLAINTIFFS CASE LAW IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

PLAINTIFFS RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

3/23/2022: PLAINTIFFS RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

2/1/2022: DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

1/14/2022: SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

STIPULATION AND ORDER ALLOWING PLAINTIFF TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT TO ADD NAMED PLAINTIFF

1/13/2022: STIPULATION AND ORDER ALLOWING PLAINTIFF TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT TO ADD NAMED PLAINTIFF

MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO ADD NAMED PLAINTIIFF AND AMEND COMPLAINT

11/18/2021: MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO ADD NAMED PLAINTIIFF AND AMEND COMPLAINT

PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF SERVICE OF THIRD REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT

10/12/2023: PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF SERVICE OF THIRD REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT

DEFENDANTS RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFFS SECOND REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT

7/5/2023: DEFENDANTS RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFFS SECOND REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT

PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF SERVICE OF SECOND REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT

6/6/2023: PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF SERVICE OF SECOND REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT

NOTICE OF SERVING REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF COPIES

1/30/2023: NOTICE OF SERVING REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF COPIES

REQUEST FOR COPIES

1/19/2023: REQUEST FOR COPIES

PLAINTIFFS ANTONIO BROWN AND JENNIFER JACKSONS NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTIES

12/13/2022: PLAINTIFFS ANTONIO BROWN AND JENNIFER JACKSONS NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTIES

PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS TO DEFENDANT

9/26/2022: PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS TO DEFENDANT

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF DEFENDANT CITY OF TALLAHASSEES FIRST INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF, ANTONIO BROWN

8/25/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF DEFENDANT CITY OF TALLAHASSEES FIRST INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF, ANTONIO BROWN

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF DEFENDANT CITY OF TALLAHASSEES FIRST INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF, JENNIFER JACKSON

8/25/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF DEFENDANT CITY OF TALLAHASSEES FIRST INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF, JENNIFER JACKSON

34 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

10/12/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Code: NOTO; Docket Text: PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF SERVICE OF THIRD REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/05/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Code: RESP; Docket Text: DEFENDANTS RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFFS SECOND REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/06/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Code: NOTO; Docket Text: PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF SERVICE OF SECOND REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/30/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Code: NOTO; Docket Text: NOTICE OF SERVING REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF COPIES; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/19/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Code: RQFC; Docket Text: REQUEST FOR COPIES; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/13/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Code: NOPR; Docket Text: PLAINTIFFS ANTONIO BROWN AND JENNIFER JACKSONS NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTIES; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/26/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Code: NOTO; Docket Text: PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS TO DEFENDANT; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/25/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Code: NSOI; Docket Text: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF DEFENDANT CITY OF TALLAHASSEES FIRST INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF, ANTONIO BROWN; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/25/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Code: NSOI; Docket Text: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF DEFENDANT CITY OF TALLAHASSEES FIRST INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF, JENNIFER JACKSON; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/19/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Code: RDD; Docket Text: DEFENDANTS RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFFS FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
34 More Docket Entries
10/06/2020
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Code: DOEA; Docket Text: DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND EMAIL ADDRESS; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/06/2020
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Code: NAPR; Docket Text: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FILED; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/02/2020
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Code: ROSE; Docket Text: RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/25/2020

DispositionAction Description: OTHER CIRCUIT CIVIL; Open/Reopen Status: OPEN; Open/Reopen Date: 9/25/2020; Judge: MARSH

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/25/2020
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Code: RECEIPT; Docket Text: PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #1530323; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/25/2020
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Code: SUIS; Docket Text: SUMMONS ISSUED; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/25/2020
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Code: DOEA; Docket Text: DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND EMAIL ADDRESS; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/25/2020
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Code: COMP_CA; Docket Text: COMPLAINT; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/25/2020
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Code: CCS; Docket Text: CIVIL COVER SHEET; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/25/2020

DocketDocket Code: a002; Docket Text: JUDGE DODSON, CHARLES W: ASSIGNED; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less