This case was last updated from Leon County Courts on 12/01/2022 at 02:07:53 (UTC).

BRIGHT, TOMEKA vs MAGAR, CHRISTIAN JAMES

Case Summary

On 06/27/2022 BRIGHT, TOMEKA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against MAGAR, CHRISTIAN JAMES. This case was filed in Leon County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Leon, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are J MARSH and J SMITH. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************1098

  • Filing Date:

    06/27/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Leon, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

J MARSH

J SMITH

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BRIGHT, TOMEKA

Tallahassee, FL 32301

Defendants

MAGAR, CHRISTIAN JAMES

Tallahassee, FL 32301

MAGAR, PEGGY JEAN

Tallahassee, FL 32317

MAGAR, RICHARD A

Tallahassee, FL 32317

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ANNA R NORRIS

313 N Monroe St., Suite 401, 3133588

Tallahassee, FL 32301

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

6/27/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

6/27/2022: COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ISSUED

6/27/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

6/27/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

6/27/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED

PAYMENT $430.00 RECEIPT #1648018

6/28/2022: PAYMENT $430.00 RECEIPT #1648018

UNIFORM ORDER FOR ACTIVE, DIFFERENTIAL CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT E-NOTICED via email on 2022-06-28

6/28/2022: UNIFORM ORDER FOR ACTIVE, DIFFERENTIAL CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT E-NOTICED via email on 2022-06-28

PLAINTIFFS FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT CHRISTIAN JAMES MAGAR

7/11/2022: PLAINTIFFS FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT CHRISTIAN JAMES MAGAR

PLAINTIFFS FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT, PEGGY JEAN MAGAR

7/11/2022: PLAINTIFFS FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT, PEGGY JEAN MAGAR

PLAINTIFFS FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT, RICHARD A. MAGAR

7/11/2022: PLAINTIFFS FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT, RICHARD A. MAGAR

PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF SERVICE OF FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT, CHRISTIAN JAMES MAGAR

7/11/2022: PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF SERVICE OF FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT, CHRISTIAN JAMES MAGAR

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT, PEGGY JEAN MAGAR

7/11/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT, PEGGY JEAN MAGAR

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT, RICHARD A. MAGAR

7/11/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT, RICHARD A. MAGAR

PLAINTIFFS FIRST REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFENDANT, PEGGY JEAN MAGAR

7/11/2022: PLAINTIFFS FIRST REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFENDANT, PEGGY JEAN MAGAR

PLAINTIFFS FIRST REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFENDANT CHRISTIAN JAMES MAGAR

7/11/2022: PLAINTIFFS FIRST REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFENDANT CHRISTIAN JAMES MAGAR

PLAINTIFFS FIRST REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFENDANT, RICHARD A. MAGAR

7/11/2022: PLAINTIFFS FIRST REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFENDANT, RICHARD A. MAGAR

RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED R MAGAR

7/29/2022: RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED R MAGAR

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: ROSE; Docket Text: RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED R MAGAR; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: RQPR; Docket Text: PLAINTIFFS FIRST REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFENDANT, RICHARD A. MAGAR; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: RQPR; Docket Text: PLAINTIFFS FIRST REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFENDANT CHRISTIAN JAMES MAGAR; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: RQPR; Docket Text: PLAINTIFFS FIRST REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFENDANT, PEGGY JEAN MAGAR; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: NSOI; Docket Text: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT, RICHARD A. MAGAR; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: NSOI; Docket Text: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT, PEGGY JEAN MAGAR; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: NSOI; Docket Text: PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF SERVICE OF FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT, CHRISTIAN JAMES MAGAR; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: RQAD; Docket Text: PLAINTIFFS FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT, RICHARD A. MAGAR; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: RQAD; Docket Text: PLAINTIFFS FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT, PEGGY JEAN MAGAR; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: RQAD; Docket Text: PLAINTIFFS FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT CHRISTIAN JAMES MAGAR; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • DocketDocket Code: JRPAO; Docket Text: JUDGE REASSIGNMENT PER ADMIN ORDER AO2022-03 FROM JUDGE Smith TO JUDGE Marsh reassigned on: 06/30/2022; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: UOCC; Docket Text: UNIFORM ORDER FOR ACTIVE, DIFFERENTIAL CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT E-NOTICED via email on 2022-06-28; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: RECEIPT; Docket Text: PAYMENT $430.00 RECEIPT #1648018; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • DocketDocket Code: a002; Docket Text: JUDGE SMITH, J LAYNE: ASSIGNED; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • DispositionAction Description: AUTO NEGLIGENCE; Open/Reopen Status: OPEN; Open/Reopen Date: 6/27/2022; Judge: MARSH

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: SUIS; Docket Text: SUMMONS ISSUED; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: SUIS; Docket Text: SUMMONS ISSUED; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: SUIS; Docket Text: SUMMONS ISSUED; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: COMP_CA; Docket Text: COMPLAINT; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: CCS; Docket Text: CIVIL COVER SHEET; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer NORRIS, ANNA R