This case was last updated from Leon County Courts on 03/28/2023 at 21:34:21 (UTC).

BRANDAKO INC vs STATE OF FLORIDA

Case Summary

On 10/31/2022 BRANDAKO INC filed an Intellectual Property - Other Intellectual Property lawsuit against STATE OF FLORIDA. This case was filed in Leon County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Leon, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is ANGELA DEMPSEY. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************1947

  • Filing Date:

    10/31/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Other Intellectual Property

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Leon, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

ANGELA DEMPSEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BRANDAKO INC

CLERVRAIN, MANETIRONY

Defendants

STATE OF FLORIDA

THE FLORIDA BAR

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

10/31/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

10/31/2022: COMPLAINT

AFFIDAVIT

10/31/2022: AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT

10/31/2022: AFFIDAVIT

UNIFORM ORDER FOR ACTIVE, DIFFERENTIAL CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT E-NOTICED via email on 2022-11-02

11/2/2022: UNIFORM ORDER FOR ACTIVE, DIFFERENTIAL CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT E-NOTICED via email on 2022-11-02

ORDER OF DISMISSAL - Recorded (OR 5791.2215 / 20220071481)

11/8/2022: ORDER OF DISMISSAL - Recorded (OR 5791.2215 / 20220071481)

 

Docket Entries

11/08/2022

DispositionDISPOSED BY JUDGE; Action Description: OTHER INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY; Open/Reopen Status: CLOS; Open/Reopen Date: 10/31/2022 4:31:06 PM; Judge: DEMPSEY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/08/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Code: ORDS; Docket Text: ORDER OF DISMISSAL - Recorded (OR 5791.2215 / 20220071481); OR Book: 5791; OR Page: 2215; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/02/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Code: UOCC; Docket Text: UNIFORM ORDER FOR ACTIVE, DIFFERENTIAL CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT E-NOTICED via email on 2022-11-02; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/02/2022

DocketDocket Code: a002; Docket Text: JUDGE DEMPSEY, ANGELA C: ASSIGNED; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/31/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Code: AFFD; Docket Text: AFFIDAVIT; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/31/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Code: AFFD; Docket Text: AFFIDAVIT; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/31/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Code: COMP_CA; Docket Text: COMPLAINT; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/31/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Code: CCS; Docket Text: CIVIL COVER SHEET; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less