This case was last updated from Leon County Courts on 01/29/2023 at 05:19:31 (UTC).

BLATHERS, DERRICK vs NEELY, LASHRONDA

Case Summary

On 11/28/2022 BLATHERS, DERRICK filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against NEELY, LASHRONDA. This case was filed in Leon County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Leon, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is STEFANIE NEWLIN. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************3977

  • Filing Date:

    11/28/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Leon, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

STEFANIE NEWLIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BLATHERS, DERRICK

Tallahassee, FL 32301

Defendant

NEELY, LASHRONDA

Tallahassee, FL 32303

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT

11/28/2022: COMPLAINT

PAYMENT $195.00 RECEIPT #1676702

11/28/2022: PAYMENT $195.00 RECEIPT #1676702

SUMMONS ISSUED

11/28/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

11/28/2022: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED - POSTED L NEELY

12/2/2022: RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED - POSTED L NEELY

MOTION FOR DEFAULT AND DEFAULT ISSUED 12/13/2022

12/9/2022: MOTION FOR DEFAULT AND DEFAULT ISSUED 12/13/2022

MOTION FOR ENTRY OF FINAL JUDGMENT

12/9/2022: MOTION FOR ENTRY OF FINAL JUDGMENT

MEMORANDUM TO LANDLORD

12/13/2022: MEMORANDUM TO LANDLORD

AFFIDAVIT OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE

12/14/2022: AFFIDAVIT OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE

FINAL JUDGMENT EVICTION - Recorded (OR 5807.2214 / 20230001331)

1/6/2023: FINAL JUDGMENT EVICTION - Recorded (OR 5807.2214 / 20230001331)

WRIT OF POSSESSION

1/10/2023: WRIT OF POSSESSION

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: WROP; Docket Text: WRIT OF POSSESSION; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • DispositionDEFAULT & FINAL JUDGMENT; Action Description: LANDLORD-TENANT RESIDENTIAL; Open/Reopen Status: CLOS; Open/Reopen Date: 11/28/2022; Judge: NEWLIN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: FIJU; Docket Text: FINAL JUDGMENT EVICTION - Recorded (OR 5807.2214 / 20230001331); OR Book: 5807; OR Page: 2214; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: AFNM; Docket Text: AFFIDAVIT OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: MEMO; Docket Text: MEMORANDUM TO LANDLORD; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: MFFJ; Docket Text: MOTION FOR ENTRY OF FINAL JUDGMENT; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: MODEF; Docket Text: MOTION FOR DEFAULT AND DEFAULT ISSUED 12/13/2022; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: ROSE; Docket Text: RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED - POSTED L NEELY; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: CMTT; Docket Text: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: SUIS; Docket Text: SUMMONS ISSUED; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: RECEIPT; Docket Text: PAYMENT $195.00 RECEIPT #1676702; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketDocket Code: a002; Docket Text: JUDGE NEWLIN, STEFANIE M: ASSIGNED; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: COMP1_SC; Docket Text: COMPLAINT; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less