This case was last updated from Leon County Courts on 10/06/2020 at 14:50:18 (UTC).

BDEP CAPITOL VILLAGE LLC vs RIGGINS, CORNELL

Case Summary

On 09/14/2020 BDEP CAPITOL VILLAGE LLC filed a Property - Other Property lawsuit against RIGGINS, CORNELL. This case was filed in Leon County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Leon, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is NINA ASHENAFI RICHARDSON. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************1622

  • Filing Date:

    09/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Leon, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

NINA ASHENAFI RICHARDSON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BDEP CAPITOL VILLAGE LLC

2765 W Tharpe St 3113260

Tallahassee, FL 32303-3259

Defendant

RIGGINS, CORNELL

Tallahassee, FL 32303-3260

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ELWIN R THRASHER

908 North Gadsden St2487616

Tallahassee, FL 32303

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

9/11/2020: CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT FILED

9/11/2020: COMPLAINT FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED

9/11/2020: SUMMONS ISSUED

PAYMENT $195.00 RECEIPT #1528001

9/14/2020: PAYMENT $195.00 RECEIPT #1528001

RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED- POSTED

9/16/2020: RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED- POSTED

VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

9/23/2020: VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/23/2020
  • DispositionDISMISSED BEFORE HEARING; Action Description: LANDLORD-TENANT UP TO $15,000; Open/Reopen Status: CLOS; Open/Reopen Date: 9/14/2020; Judge: ASHENAFI RICHARDSON

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED- POSTED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • DocketCOPIES MAILED TO TENANT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $195.00 RECEIPT #1528001

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • DocketJUDGE ASHENAFI RICHARDSON, NINA: ASSIGNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BDEP CAPITOL VILLAGE LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ELWIN R THRASHER