This case was last updated from Leon County Courts on 04/24/2020 at 12:38:12 (UTC).

BARCLAYS BANK DELAWARE vs SCHILLING, CHARLES M JR

Case Summary

On 04/02/2019 BARCLAYS BANK DELAWARE filed an Other lawsuit against SCHILLING, CHARLES M JR. This case was filed in Leon County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Leon, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is J SMITH. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************1002

  • Filing Date:

    04/02/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Leon, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

J SMITH

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BARCLAYS BANK DELAWARE

815 Nw 57Th Avenue Ste 401 2969176

Miami, FL 33126

Defendant

SCHILLING, CHARLES M JR

Tallahassee, FL 32309

Garnishee

FIDELITY NATIONAL INFORMATION SERVICES

1200 South Pine Island Road 3090600

Plantation, FL 33324

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JORGE L PALMA

815 Nw 57Th Ave Suite 401 2959771

Miami, FL 33126

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/16/2020
  • DispositionDISPOSED; Action Description: REOPENED; Open/Reopen Status: REOPEN; Open/Reopen Date: 4/6/2020; Judge: SMITH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • HearingEvent: HEARING; Start: 10:40 AM; Location: CA1; Judge: ASHENAFI RICHARDSON; Result: HEARING HELD; Source: BM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • DispositionDISPOSED; Action Description: REOPENED; Open/Reopen Status: REOPEN; Open/Reopen Date: 2/14/2020; Judge: SMITH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • DispositionDEFAULT & FINAL JUDGMENT; Action Description: COUNTY CIVIL; Open/Reopen Status: OPEN; Open/Reopen Date: 4/2/2019; Judge: SMITH

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Fidelity National Information Services, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Barclays Bank Delaware is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Palma, Jorge L, ESQ.