Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Leon County Courts on 10/06/2020 at 14:12:30 (UTC).

AVENUE 29 APARTMENTS LLC vs ADDERLEY, KERRY

Case Summary

On 09/04/2020 AVENUE 29 APARTMENTS LLC filed a Property - Other Property lawsuit against ADDERLEY, KERRY. This case was filed in Leon County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Leon, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MONIQUE RICHARDSON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************1581

  • Filing Date:

    09/04/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property

  • Court:

    Leon County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Leon, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MONIQUE RICHARDSON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AVENUE 29 APARTMENTS LLC

2915 Sharer Rd 3111996

Tallahassee, FL 32312-2201

Defendants

ADDERLEY, KERRY

Tallahassee, FL 32312-2201

ADDERLEY, MARINA

Tallahassee, FL 32312-2201

ADDERLEY, VENESSA

Tallahassee, FL 32312-2201

ADDERLEY, JUDY

Tallahassee, FL 32312-2201

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ELWIN R THRASHER

908 North Gadsden St2487616

Tallahassee, FL 32303

 

Court Documents

ZOOM INFORMATION FOR HEARING AND REQUEST FOR FILING OF PHONE NUMBER AND EMAIL

9/23/2020: ZOOM INFORMATION FOR HEARING AND REQUEST FOR FILING OF PHONE NUMBER AND EMAIL

COURT MINUTES

9/21/2020: COURT MINUTES

NOTICE OF HEARING

9/21/2020: NOTICE OF HEARING

NOTICE OF FILING PHOTOS TAKEN OF THE PREMISES

9/18/2020: NOTICE OF FILING PHOTOS TAKEN OF THE PREMISES

NOTICE OF HEARING

9/14/2020: NOTICE OF HEARING

PAYMENT $1,000.00 RECEIPT #1527612

9/10/2020: PAYMENT $1,000.00 RECEIPT #1527612

PAYMENT $300.00 RECEIPT #1527610

9/10/2020: PAYMENT $300.00 RECEIPT #1527610

ANSWER FROM DEFENDANTS

9/10/2020: ANSWER FROM DEFENDANTS

RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED - M ADDERLEY

9/8/2020: RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED - M ADDERLEY

RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED - K ADDERLEY

9/8/2020: RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED - K ADDERLEY

RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED - J ADDERLEY

9/8/2020: RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED - J ADDERLEY

RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED - V ADDERLEY

9/8/2020: RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED - V ADDERLEY

PAYMENT $225.00 RECEIPT #1526923

9/4/2020: PAYMENT $225.00 RECEIPT #1526923

SUMMONS ISSUED

9/3/2020: SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

9/3/2020: SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

9/3/2020: SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

9/3/2020: SUMMONS ISSUED

.

9/3/2020: .

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/01/2020
  • HearingEvent: LANDLORD TENANT; Start: 8:45 AM; Location: CA1; Judge: JONES; Result: HEARING HELD; Source: BM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT MINUTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketZOOM INFORMATION FOR HEARING AND REQUEST FOR FILING OF PHONE NUMBER AND EMAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • HearingEvent: LANDLORD TENANT; Start: 8:45 AM; Location: CA1; Judge: SMITH; Result: RESET; Source: BM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT MINUTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketLANDLORD TENANT SET FOR 10/01/2020 AT 8:45 AM IN CA1, JDG: JONES, JASON LEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING PHOTOS TAKEN OF THE PREMISES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • DocketLANDLORD TENANT SET FOR 09/21/2020 AT 8:45 AM IN CA1, JDG: SMITH, J LAYNE

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 09/08/2020
  • DocketCOPIES MAILED TO TENANTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • DispositionAction Description: LANDLORD-TENANT UP TO $15,000; Open/Reopen Status: OPEN; Open/Reopen Date: 9/4/2020; Judge: RICHARDSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $225.00 RECEIPT #1526923

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • DocketJUDGE RICHARDSON, MONIQUE R: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less