This case was last updated from Leon County Courts on 11/24/2021 at 14:07:04 (UTC).

ASHBY, ANTHONY vs GAIA STONE GALLERY TALLAHASSEE CORP

Case Summary

On 11/23/2021 ASHBY, ANTHONY filed an Other lawsuit against GAIA STONE GALLERY TALLAHASSEE CORP. This case was filed in Leon County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Leon, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is NINA ASHENAFI RICHARDSON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************2822

  • Filing Date:

    11/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Leon, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

NINA ASHENAFI RICHARDSON

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ASHBY, ANTHONY

Tallahassee, FL 32311

ASHBY, GRETCHEN

Tallahassee, FL 32311

Defendants

GAIA STONE GALLERY TALLAHASSEE CORP

1704 Capital Circle Ne, 3161470

Tallahassee, FL 32308

GAIA STONE GALLERY TALY, INC.

1704 Capital Circle Ne, 3161471

Tallahassee, FL 32308

GAIA STONE GALLERY, INC.

1704 Capital Circle Ne, 3161472

Tallahassee, FL 32308

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TRUDY E INNES RICHARDSON

487 E Tennessee Street, Suite 1 3053084

Tallahassee, FL 32301

 

Court Documents

PAYMENT $300.00 RECEIPT #1605298

11/23/2021: PAYMENT $300.00 RECEIPT #1605298

PROGRESS DOCKET

11/23/2021: PROGRESS DOCKET

TRANSFER PAPERWORK FROM ORIGINATING DIVISION

11/23/2021: TRANSFER PAPERWORK FROM ORIGINATING DIVISION

MOTION FOR TRANSFER TO COUNTY COURT

11/1/2021: MOTION FOR TRANSFER TO COUNTY COURT

NOTICE FOR TRIAL

8/24/2021: NOTICE FOR TRIAL

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

8/18/2021: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

DEFAULT (ALREADY ISSUED ON 8/12/2021)

8/14/2021: DEFAULT (ALREADY ISSUED ON 8/12/2021)

DEFAULT (ALREADY ISSUED ON 8/12/2021)

8/14/2021: DEFAULT (ALREADY ISSUED ON 8/12/2021)

DEFAULT (ALREADY ISSUED ON 8/12/2021)

8/14/2021: DEFAULT (ALREADY ISSUED ON 8/12/2021)

DEFAULT ISSUED (8/12/2021 FOR GAIA STONE GALLERY TALLAHASSEE CORP)

8/11/2021: DEFAULT ISSUED (8/12/2021 FOR GAIA STONE GALLERY TALLAHASSEE CORP)

DEFAULT ISSUED (8/12/2021 FOR GAIA STONE GALLERY TALY [SIC] INC)

8/11/2021: DEFAULT ISSUED (8/12/2021 FOR GAIA STONE GALLERY TALY [SIC] INC)

DEFAULT ISSUED (8/12/2021 FOR GAIA STONE GALLERY INC)

8/11/2021: DEFAULT ISSUED (8/12/2021 FOR GAIA STONE GALLERY INC)

MOTION FOR DEFAULT

8/5/2021: MOTION FOR DEFAULT

NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY

7/21/2021: NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY

RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED - GAIA STONE GALLERY INC

7/7/2021: RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED - GAIA STONE GALLERY INC

RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED - GAIA STONE GALLERY TALY (SIC) INC

7/7/2021: RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED - GAIA STONE GALLERY TALY (SIC) INC

RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED - GAIA STONE GALLERY TALLAHASSEE CORP

7/7/2021: RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED - GAIA STONE GALLERY TALLAHASSEE CORP

UNIFORM ORDER FOR ACTIVE, DIFFERENTIAL CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT

6/18/2021: UNIFORM ORDER FOR ACTIVE, DIFFERENTIAL CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/23/2021
  • DispositionAction Description: COUNTY CIVIL OVER $8,000 BUT LESS THAN $15,000; Open/Reopen Status: OPEN; Open/Reopen Date: 11/23/2021; Judge: ASHENAFI RICHARDSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $300.00 RECEIPT #1605298

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketTRANSFERRED. FROM CIRCUIT CIVIL TO COUNTY CIVIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROGRESS DOCKET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRANSFER PAPERWORK FROM ORIGINATING DIVISION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketJUDGE ASHENAFI RICHARDSON, NINA: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • DocketCASE TRANSFERRED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR TRANSFER TO COUNTY COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE FOR TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED - GAIA STONE GALLERY TALY (SIC) INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED - GAIA STONE GALLERY TALLAHASSEE CORP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUNIFORM ORDER FOR ACTIVE, DIFFERENTIAL CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $30.00 RECEIPT #1576837

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $400.00 RECEIPT #1576791

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer TRUDY E INNES RICHARDSON