This case was last updated from Leon County Courts on 04/29/2020 at 09:38:24 (UTC).

AMERICAN FINANCIAL RESOURCES INC vs UNKNOWN HEIRS DEVISEES GRANTEES ASSIGNEES LIENORS

Case Summary

On 06/22/2018 AMERICAN FINANCIAL RESOURCES INC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against UNKNOWN HEIRS DEVISEES GRANTEES ASSIGNEES LIENORS. This case was filed in Leon County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Leon, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are JOHN COOPER and CHARLES DODSON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************1391

  • Filing Date:

    06/22/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Leon, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

JOHN COOPER

CHARLES DODSON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AMERICAN FINANCIAL RESOURCES INC

Po Box 23028 2975091

Tampa, FL 33623

Defendants

LEON COUNTY CLERK OF THE COURT

Leon County Clerk Of Courts 301 S Monroe Street Rm 100 2810496

Tallahassee, FL 32301

UNKNOWN PARTY 3

Tallahassee, FL 32301

MCGEE, KALYX

Denton, TX 76205

UNKNOWN PARTY 1

Tallahassee, FL 32301

MORRIS, TAJH KHIRY

Raiford, FL 32026

UNKNOWN PARTY 4

Tallahassee, FL 32301

UNKNOWN HEIRS DEVISEES GRANTEES ASSIGNEES LIENORS

Tallahassee, FL 32301

SIMPSON, DE KERION

Mesquite, TX 75149

DIAMONDHEAD HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC

2815 Par Lane 2992718

Tallahassee, FL 32311

UNKNOWN PARTY 2

Tallahassee, FL 32301

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

JOSHUA DAVID PASQUALONE

Po Box 23028 2958517

Tampa, FL 33623

SHIKITA PARKER

Po Box 230282909350

Tampa, FL 33623

Defendant Attorney

JAMI A COLEMAN

701 E. Tennessee Street2814243

Tallahassee, FL 32308

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/07/2020
  • HearingEvent: NON-JURY TRIAL; Start: 9:30 AM; Location: 365B; Judge: COOPER; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • HearingEvent: NON-JURY TRIAL; Start: 10:00 AM; Location: 365B; Judge: COOPER; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • HearingEvent: NON-JURY TRIAL; Start: 2:00 PM; Location: 365B; Judge: COOPER; Result: CONTINUED; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • HearingEvent: MOTION HEARING; Start: 2:30 PM; Location: 365B; Judge: COOPER; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2018
  • DispositionAction Description: MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE HOMESTEAD RESIDENTIAL MORE THAN $50,000 BUT LESS THAN $250,000; Open/Reopen Status: OPEN; Open/Reopen Date: 6/22/2018; Judge: COOPER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LEON COUNTY CLERK OF THE COURT is a litigant

Latest cases where American Financial Resources Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PASQUALONE, JOSHUA D

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SHIKITA PARKER, ESQ