This case was last updated from Leon County Courts on 01/26/2023 at 07:24:10 (UTC).

AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK vs CUMMINGS, JOSHUA

Case Summary

On 10/17/2022 AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against CUMMINGS, JOSHUA. This case was filed in Leon County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Leon, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is STEFANIE NEWLIN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************1956

  • Filing Date:

    10/17/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Leon, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

STEFANIE NEWLIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK

1551 Sawgrass Corporate Parkway, Suite 110 3254255

Sunrise, FL 33323

Defendant

CUMMINGS, JOSHUA

Tallahassee, FL 32312

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SCOTT E MODLIN

1551 Sawgrass Corporate Parkway, Suite 110 2798751

Sunrise, FL 33323

Defendant Attorney

ROBERT G CHURCHILL

908 Thomasville Road, 3242782

Tallahassee, FL 32303

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

10/17/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

SUMMONS ISSUED

10/17/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED

STATEMENT OF CLAIM/COMPLAINT

10/17/2022: STATEMENT OF CLAIM/COMPLAINT

PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #1669073

10/17/2022: PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #1669073

RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED - SUB J CUMMINGS

11/18/2022: RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED - SUB J CUMMINGS

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL, DENIAL OF CLAIMS ON THE MERITS AND NOTICE OF INTENT TO SEEK PREVAILING PARTY ATTORNEY FEES AND NOTICE OF DESIGNATED EMAIL ADDRESS FOR SERVICE

11/28/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL, DENIAL OF CLAIMS ON THE MERITS AND NOTICE OF INTENT TO SEEK PREVAILING PARTY ATTORNEY FEES AND NOTICE OF DESIGNATED EMAIL ADDRESS FOR SERVICE

COURT MINUTES

12/6/2022: COURT MINUTES

NOTICE OF HEARING

12/6/2022: NOTICE OF HEARING

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/14/2023
  • HearingEvent: PRETRIAL SC; Start: 9:30 AM; Location: CA1; Judge: NEWLIN; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • HearingEvent: PRETRIAL SC; Start: 9:30 AM; Location: CA1; Judge: NEWLIN; Result: RESET; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: NOH; Docket Text: NOTICE OF HEARING; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: CTCM; Docket Text: COURT MINUTES; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • DocketDocket Code: a120; Docket Text: PRETRIAL SC SET FOR 02/14/2023 AT 9:30 AM IN CA1, JDG: NEWLIN, STEFANIE M; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: NAPR; Docket Text: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL, DENIAL OF CLAIMS ON THE MERITS AND NOTICE OF INTENT TO SEEK PREVAILING PARTY ATTORNEY FEES AND NOTICE OF DESIGNATED EMAIL ADDRESS FOR SERVICE; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: ROSE; Docket Text: RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED - SUB J CUMMINGS; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2022
  • DispositionAction Description: SMALL CLAIMS MORE THAN $5,000 BUT NOT MORE THAN $8000; Open/Reopen Status: OPEN; Open/Reopen Date: 10/17/2022; Judge: NEWLIN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: RECEIPT; Docket Text: PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #1669073; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: COCOMP_SC; Docket Text: STATEMENT OF CLAIM/COMPLAINT; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: SUIS; Docket Text: SUMMONS ISSUED; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: CCS; Docket Text: CIVIL COVER SHEET; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2022
  • DocketDocket Code: a002; Docket Text: JUDGE NEWLIN, STEFANIE M: ASSIGNED; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2022
  • DocketDocket Code: a120; Docket Text: PRETRIAL SC SET FOR 12/06/2022 AT 9:30 AM IN CA1, JDG: NEWLIN, STEFANIE M; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less