This case was last updated from Second Circuit Courts - Leon County on 02/27/2021 at 04:41:34 (UTC).

ALLEN, DAWN vs BURLINGTON COAT FACTORY

Case Summary

On 01/22/2021 ALLEN, DAWN filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against BURLINGTON COAT FACTORY. This case was filed in Second Circuit Courts - Leon County, Not Classified By Court located in Leon, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is ANGELA DEMPSEY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************0152

  • Filing Date:

    01/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Leon, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

ANGELA DEMPSEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ALLEN, DAWN

Tallahassee, FL 32301

Defendant

BURLINGTON COAT FACTORY

1200 South Pine Island Road 3134892

Plantation, FL 33324

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TODD C HUNTER

313 N Monroe St Suite 401 3070597

Tallahassee, FL 32301

Defendant Attorneys

KAYLA M SCARPONE

305 South Gadsden Street 3004774

Tallahassee, FL 32301

ELIZABETH B BURGESS

305 S Gadsden St2554082

Tallahassee, FL 32301

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

1/22/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

SUMMONS ISSUED

1/22/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED

COMPLAINT

1/22/2021: COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

1/22/2021: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

1/22/2021: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

1/22/2021: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #1549456

1/25/2021: PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #1549456

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FILED

2/4/2021: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FILED

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

2/17/2021: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF DEFENDANTS FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF

2/23/2021: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF DEFENDANTS FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF

DEFENDANTS FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS FROM PLAINTIFF

2/23/2021: DEFENDANTS FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS FROM PLAINTIFF

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANTS FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS FROM PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF DEFENDANTS FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #1549456

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketJUDGE DEMPSEY, ANGELA C: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DispositionAction Description: NEGLIGENCE PREMISES LIABILITY COMMERCIAL; Open/Reopen Status: OPEN; Open/Reopen Date: 1/22/2021; Judge: DEMPSEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BURLINGTON COAT FACTORY OF FLORIDA LLC is a litigant