Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Leon County Courts on 06/23/2020 at 15:57:31 (UTC).

ALL INSURANCE RESTORATION SERVICES INC vs CITIZENS PROPERTY INSURANCE CORPORATE

Case Summary

On 06/12/2020 ALL INSURANCE RESTORATION SERVICES INC filed an Other lawsuit against CITIZENS PROPERTY INSURANCE CORPORATE. This case was filed in Leon County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Leon, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is ANTHONY MILLER. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************1260

  • Filing Date:

    06/12/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Leon County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Leon, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

ANTHONY MILLER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ALL INSURANCE RESTORATION SERVICES INC

Defendant

CITIZENS PROPERTY INSURANCE CORPORATE

 

Court Documents

LETTER

6/12/2020: LETTER

ORDER GRANTING

6/12/2020: ORDER GRANTING

LETTER OF CORRESPONDENCE

3/18/2020: LETTER OF CORRESPONDENCE

MEMORANDUM OF DISPOSITION

2/24/2020: MEMORANDUM OF DISPOSITION

NOTICE OF HEARING 2/24/2020 @ 2:15 PM

12/19/2019: NOTICE OF HEARING 2/24/2020 @ 2:15 PM

NOTICE OF HEARING 11/21/2019 @ 1:30 PM SDJC

10/14/2019: NOTICE OF HEARING 11/21/2019 @ 1:30 PM SDJC

NOTICE OF HEARING 11/21/2019 @ 1:30 PM

10/11/2019: NOTICE OF HEARING 11/21/2019 @ 1:30 PM

MOTION FOR RECONCSIDERATION

10/10/2019: MOTION FOR RECONCSIDERATION

MOTION FOR DEFAULT

10/9/2019: MOTION FOR DEFAULT

ORDER DENYING DEFS MOTION TO DISMISS FOR IMPROPER VENUE

7/11/2019: ORDER DENYING DEFS MOTION TO DISMISS FOR IMPROPER VENUE

MEMORANDUM OF DISPOSITION

7/11/2019: MEMORANDUM OF DISPOSITION

RESPONSE TO MOTION TO DISMISS

7/10/2019: RESPONSE TO MOTION TO DISMISS

NOTICE OF ANSWER TO INTERROGATORIES

6/27/2019: NOTICE OF ANSWER TO INTERROGATORIES

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

6/27/2019: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

6/3/2019: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

MOTION TO DISMISS FOR IMPROPER VENUE

6/3/2019: MOTION TO DISMISS FOR IMPROPER VENUE

(M) 20 DAY (C) SUMMONS (SUB) RECEIVED

5/6/2019: (M) 20 DAY (C) SUMMONS (SUB) RECEIVED

STATEMENT OF CLAIM/COMPLAINT

5/3/2019: STATEMENT OF CLAIM/COMPLAINT

21 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $300.00 RECEIPT #1516106

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • DocketTRANSFERRED. FROM ANOTHER COUNTY (MIAMI-DADE COUNTY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • DocketJUDGE MILLER, ANTHONY B: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • DispositionOTHER; Action Description: COUNTY CIVIL OVER $8,000 BUT LESS THAN $15,000; Open/Reopen Status: CLOS; Open/Reopen Date: 6/12/2020; Judge: MILLER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER GRANTING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROGRESS DOCKET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRECEIPT LETTER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER OF CORRESPONDENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRECEIPT FOR FILE

    Read MoreRead Less
22 More Docket Entries
  • 06/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO DISMISS FOR IMPROPER VENUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • DocketESUMMONS 20 DAY ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(M) 20 DAY (C) SUMMONS (SUB) RECEIVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED 20 DAY CITIZENS PROPERTY INSURANCE CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM/COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF INTERROGATORY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less