This case was last updated from Leon County Courts on 06/24/2023 at 14:06:16 (UTC).

ALEXANDER WINTON & ASSOCIATES INC. vs FRONTIER COMMUNICATIONS OF AMERICA INC.

Case Summary

On 03/22/2023 ALEXANDER WINTON ASSOCIATES INC filed an Other lawsuit against FRONTIER COMMUNICATIONS OF AMERICA INC. This case was filed in Leon County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Leon, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is NINA ASHENAFI RICHARDSON. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************1110

  • Filing Date:

    03/22/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Leon, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

NINA ASHENAFI RICHARDSON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ALEXANDER, WINTON & ASSOCIATES, INC.

Defendants

FRONTIER COMMUNICATIONS OF AMERICA, INC.

FRONTIER COMMUNICATIONS CORPORATE SERVICES, INC.

FRONTIER COMMUNICATIONS OF THE SOUTH, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BRADLEY ALAN SINGER

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

3/22/2023: CIVIL COVER SHEET

STATEMENT OF CLAIM/COMPLAINT

3/22/2023: STATEMENT OF CLAIM/COMPLAINT

PAYMENT $300.00 RECEIPT #1701444

3/28/2023: PAYMENT $300.00 RECEIPT #1701444

UNIFORM ORDER FOR ACTIVE, DIFFERENTIAL CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT E-NOTICED via email on 2023-03-28

3/28/2023: UNIFORM ORDER FOR ACTIVE, DIFFERENTIAL CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT E-NOTICED via email on 2023-03-28

SUMMONS ISSUED

3/28/2023: SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

3/28/2023: SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

3/28/2023: SUMMONS ISSUED

PAYMENT $30.00 RECEIPT #1701968

3/29/2023: PAYMENT $30.00 RECEIPT #1701968

RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED-FRONTIER COMMUNICATIONS CORPORATE SERVICES INC

4/7/2023: RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED-FRONTIER COMMUNICATIONS CORPORATE SERVICES INC

RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED--FRONTIER COMMUNICATIONS CORPORATE SERVICES INC

4/7/2023: RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED--FRONTIER COMMUNICATIONS CORPORATE SERVICES INC

RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED--FRONTIER COMMUNICATIONS CORPORATE SERVICES INC

4/7/2023: RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED--FRONTIER COMMUNICATIONS CORPORATE SERVICES INC

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

6/20/2023: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

 

Docket Entries

06/21/2023

DispositionDISMISSED BEFORE HEARING; Action Description: COUNTY CIVIL OVER $8,000 BUT LESS THAN $15,000; Open/Reopen Status: CLOS; Open/Reopen Date: 3/22/2023; Judge: ASHENAFI RICHARDSON

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/20/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Code: NVD; Docket Text: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/07/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Code: ROSE; Docket Text: RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED--FRONTIER COMMUNICATIONS CORPORATE SERVICES INC; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/07/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Code: ROSE; Docket Text: RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED--FRONTIER COMMUNICATIONS CORPORATE SERVICES INC; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/07/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Code: ROSE; Docket Text: RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED-FRONTIER COMMUNICATIONS CORPORATE SERVICES INC; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/29/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Code: RECEIPT; Docket Text: PAYMENT $30.00 RECEIPT #1701968; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/28/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Code: SUIS; Docket Text: SUMMONS ISSUED; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/28/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Code: SUIS; Docket Text: SUMMONS ISSUED; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/28/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Code: SUIS; Docket Text: SUMMONS ISSUED; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/28/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Code: UOCC; Docket Text: UNIFORM ORDER FOR ACTIVE, DIFFERENTIAL CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT E-NOTICED via email on 2023-03-28; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/28/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Code: RECEIPT; Docket Text: PAYMENT $300.00 RECEIPT #1701444; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/28/2023

DocketDocket Code: a002; Docket Text: JUDGE ASHENAFI RICHARDSON, NINA: ASSIGNED; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/22/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Code: COCOMP_SC; Docket Text: STATEMENT OF CLAIM/COMPLAINT; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/22/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Code: CCS; Docket Text: CIVIL COVER SHEET; Source: BM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less