This case was last updated from Leon County Courts on 05/24/2023 at 02:01:35 (UTC).

ADAMS, AMANDA vs CITY OF TALLAHASSEE

Case Summary

On 01/31/2023 ADAMS, AMANDA filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against CITY OF TALLAHASSEE. This case was filed in Leon County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Leon, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is ANGELA DEMPSEY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************0181

  • Filing Date:

    01/31/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Leon, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

ANGELA DEMPSEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ADAMS, AMANDA

Defendant

CITY OF TALLAHASSEE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MUTAQEE N AKBAR

Defendant Attorney

JAMES N FLOYD

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

1/30/2023: CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

1/30/2023: COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ISSUED

1/30/2023: SUMMONS ISSUED

PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #1688602

1/31/2023: PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #1688602

UNIFORM ORDER FOR ACTIVE, DIFFERENTIAL CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT E-NOTICED via email on 2023-01-31

1/31/2023: UNIFORM ORDER FOR ACTIVE, DIFFERENTIAL CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT E-NOTICED via email on 2023-01-31

RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED-C JACKSON

2/16/2023: RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED-C JACKSON

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

3/2/2023: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

DEFENDANT CITY OF TALLAHASSEES NOTICE OF SERVING FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES ON PLAINTIFF

3/2/2023: DEFENDANT CITY OF TALLAHASSEES NOTICE OF SERVING FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES ON PLAINTIFF

DEFENDANTS FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION FROM PLAINTIFF

3/2/2023: DEFENDANTS FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION FROM PLAINTIFF

NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTIES

3/30/2023: NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTIES

PLAINTIFF NOTICE OF SERVING FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES ON DEFENDANT

4/13/2023: PLAINTIFF NOTICE OF SERVING FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES ON DEFENDANT

PLAINTIFFS FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

4/13/2023: PLAINTIFFS FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTIES

4/25/2023: NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTIES

PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF SERVING RESPONSES TO DEFENDANTS FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION AND FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES

4/25/2023: PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF SERVING RESPONSES TO DEFENDANTS FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION AND FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES

NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTIES

4/26/2023: NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTIES

ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MEDIATION

5/17/2023: ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MEDIATION

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF DEFENDANTS ANSWERS TO PLAINTIFFS FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES

5/17/2023: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF DEFENDANTS ANSWERS TO PLAINTIFFS FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: NOTO; Docket Text: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF DEFENDANTS ANSWERS TO PLAINTIFFS FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: ORME; Docket Text: ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MEDIATION; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: NOPR; Docket Text: NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTIES; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: NOTO; Docket Text: PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF SERVING RESPONSES TO DEFENDANTS FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION AND FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: NOPR; Docket Text: NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTIES; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: RQPR; Docket Text: PLAINTIFFS FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: NSOI; Docket Text: PLAINTIFF NOTICE OF SERVING FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES ON DEFENDANT; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: NOPR; Docket Text: NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTIES; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: RQPR; Docket Text: DEFENDANTS FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION FROM PLAINTIFF; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: NSOI; Docket Text: DEFENDANT CITY OF TALLAHASSEES NOTICE OF SERVING FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES ON PLAINTIFF; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: AAAD; Docket Text: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: ROSE; Docket Text: RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED-C JACKSON; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • DispositionAction Description: NEGLIGENCE PREMISES LIABILITY COMMERCIAL; Open/Reopen Status: OPEN; Open/Reopen Date: 1/31/2023 8:28:25 AM; Judge: DEMPSEY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: UOCC; Docket Text: UNIFORM ORDER FOR ACTIVE, DIFFERENTIAL CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT E-NOTICED via email on 2023-01-31; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: RECEIPT; Docket Text: PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #1688602; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketDocket Code: a002; Docket Text: JUDGE DEMPSEY, ANGELA C: ASSIGNED; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: SUIS; Docket Text: SUMMONS ISSUED; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: COMP_CA; Docket Text: COMPLAINT; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Code: CCS; Docket Text: CIVIL COVER SHEET; Source: BM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less