This case was last updated from Lake County Courts on 08/08/2020 at 08:15:14 (UTC).

WOLFE JR, WARREN CHARLES

Case Summary

On 07/11/2020 WOLFE JR, WARREN CHARLES was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Lake County Courts, Lake County Courthouse located in Lake, Florida. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    07/11/2020

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Courthouse:

    Lake County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Lake, Florida

 

Party Details

Defendant

WOLFE JR, WARREN CHARLES

 

Court Documents

CONTRACT FOR PARTIAL PAYMENTS SIGNED; OWES $25.00 SERVICE CHARGE

08/06/2020: CONTRACT FOR PARTIAL PAYMENTS SIGNED; OWES $25.00 SERVICE CHARGE

 

Docket Entries

08/07/2020

DocketDescription: CERTIFIED COPY OF FINAL JUDGMENT ASSESSING FEES, SERVICE CHARGES, COSTS AND FINES; Book: 5519; Page: 817

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/06/2020

HearingEvent Type: ARSCJ5 - ARRAIGNMENT SENIOR COVERAGE JUDGE 5; Location: TAVARES; Room: SCJ5

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/06/2020

FinancialDescription: #Lake - Criminal Cost of Prosecution 2; Amount Due: 100.0; Balance: 100.0; Due Date: 2020-09-08; In Judgement: 2020-08-06

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/06/2020

FinancialDescription: #Lake - MM Drug and Alcohol Cost ($15); Amount Due: 15.0; Balance: 15.0; Due Date: 2020-09-08; In Judgement: 2020-08-06

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/06/2020

FinancialDescription: #Lake - Criminal Recording & Satisfaction Fees ($22); Amount Due: 22.0; Balance: 22.0; Due Date: 2020-09-08; In Judgement: 2020-08-06

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/06/2020

FinancialDescription: #Lake - Criminal Standard/Mandatory Cost; Amount Due: 223.0; Balance: 223.0; Due Date: 2020-09-08; In Judgement: 2020-08-06

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/06/2020

FinancialDescription: #Lake - Criminal Discretionary Fine (with 5% surcharge); Amount Due: 210.0; Amount Paid: 200.0; Balance: 10.0; Due Date: 2020-09-08; In Judgement: 2020-08-06

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/06/2020

FinancialDescription: Lake - $25.00 Payment Plan Fee; Amount Due: 25.0; Balance: 25.0; Due Date: 2020-09-08

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/06/2020
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: CONTRACT FOR PARTIAL PAYMENTS SIGNED; OWES $25.00 SERVICE CHARGE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/06/2020

DocketDescription: PAYMENT PLAN SCHEDULE; Text: PAYMENT PLAN CREATED FOR: $44.00-MONTHLY BEGINNING 09/08/2020

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11 More Docket Entries
08/06/2020

DocketDescription: Early term if in full compliance; Count: 1

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/06/2020

DocketDescription: 6 months Probation; No Probation if fine paid & costs paid today; Count: 1

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/06/2020

DocketDescription: ADJUDICATED GUILTY; Count: 1

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/06/2020

DocketDescription: NOLO CONTENDERE; Count: 1

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/22/2020

DocketDescription: INFORMATION FILED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/17/2020

DocketDescription: SCHEDULING LETTER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/17/2020

DocketDescription: SET ON ARSCJ5 - ARRAIGNMENT SENIOR COVERAGE JUDGE 5 DOCKET 8/6/2020 BEGINNING AT 9:00 AM; Text: ARSCJ5 - ARRAIGNMENT SENIOR COVERAGE JUDGE 5 8/6/2020 9:00 AM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/14/2020

DocketDescription: AFFIDAVIT FILED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/11/2020

ChargeDescription: OPEN CONTAINER; Disposition: Adjudicated Guilty; Count: 1; Statute: 88888888888; Disposition Date: 2020-08-06; Offense Date: 2020-07-11; Offence Level: CN; Plea: Nolo Contendere; Plea Date: 2020-08-06

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/11/2020

DocketDescription: 88888888888 POSSESSION/ CONSUMPTION OF ALCOHOL IN SILVER GLEN RUN; Text: 88888888888; Count: 1

[+] Read More [-] Read Less