This case was last updated from Lake County Florida Courts on 03/20/2020 at 20:22:02 (UTC).

WIENECKE, TRAVIS PAUL

Case Summary

On 12/26/2018 WIENECKE, TRAVIS PAUL was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Lake County Florida Courts, Lake County Courthouse located in Lake, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is RADA, CARY F. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    12/26/2018

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Lake, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

RADA, CARY F

 

Party Details

Defendant

WIENECKE, TRAVIS PAUL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

AZCANO, ROBERT C

 

Court Documents

BOND DISCHARGED

06/11/2019 BOND DISCHARGED

BOND DISCHARGED

06/11/2019 BOND DISCHARGED

CONTRACT FOR PARTIAL PAYMENTS SIGNED; OWES $25.00 SERVICE CHARGE; $4803 @ $61 PER MONTH FOR 80 MONTHS

06/11/2019 CONTRACT FOR PARTIAL PAYMENTS SIGNED; OWES $25.00 SERVICE CHARGE; $4803 @ $61 PER MONTH FOR 80 MONTHS

WRITTEN PLEA AGREEMENT

06/11/2019 WRITTEN PLEA AGREEMENT

COUNTY PROBATION FINANCIAL COST MEMO

06/12/2019 COUNTY PROBATION FINANCIAL COST MEMO

ORDER OF IMPOUNDMENT OR IMMOBILIZATION

06/17/2019 ORDER OF IMPOUNDMENT OR IMMOBILIZATION

NOTICE OF IMMOBILIZATION

06/17/2019 NOTICE OF IMMOBILIZATION

CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT RETURNED

06/26/2019 CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT RETURNED

CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT RETURNED

06/27/2019 CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT RETURNED

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/20/2019
  • FinancialDescription: Lake - Criminal/Civil Clearance Fee (Fail to Pay- D6); Amount Due: 7.0; Balance: 7.0; Due Date: 2019-08-20

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • DocketDescription: JUDGMENT OF GUILT & PLACING DEFENDANT ON PROBATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • FinancialDescription: #Lake - Criminal Late Fee; Amount Due: 25.0; Balance: 25.0; Due Date: 2019-07-15

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • DocketDescription: LATE NOTICE SENT TO DEFENDANT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT RETURNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT RETURNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • DocketDescription: TAG VERIFICATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: NOTICE OF IMMOBILIZATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ORDER OF IMPOUNDMENT OR IMMOBILIZATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • FinancialDescription: Lake - Probation #Supervision Fee (In & Out of County); Amount Due: 680.0; Balance: 680.0; Due Date: 2019-06-17

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
131 More Docket Entries
  • 12/26/2018
  • DocketDescription: AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENT STATUS - QUALIFIES FOR PUBLIC DEFENDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/26/2018
  • DocketDescription: ARREST AFFIDAVIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/26/2018
  • DocketDescription: 843.02 RESIST OFFICER-OBSTRUCT WO VIOLENCE; Text: 843.02; Count: 2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/26/2018
  • DocketDescription: 316.193(4) DUI- .15 OR HIGHER OR WITH PERSON UNDER 18- 2ND OFF; Text: 316.193(4); Count: 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/26/2018
  • DocketDescription: UNIFORM TRAFFIC CITATION FILED FOR 316.193(4), $0.00; Text: 0756XEG 12/21/2018 LAKE COUNTY SHERIFFS OFFICE 316.193(4) $0.00; Count: 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/24/2018
  • BondBond #: X6-0383195; Type: Surety; Count: 2; Bondsman: A AMERICAN BONDING- GROVELAND; Suerety Company: U.S. Specialty Insurance Company; Closed Date: 2019-06-11; Amount: 1000.0; Status: Closed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/24/2018
  • BondBond #: X6-0383194; Type: Surety; Count: 1; Bondsman: A AMERICAN BONDING- GROVELAND; Suerety Company: U.S. Specialty Insurance Company; Closed Date: 2019-06-11; Amount: 6000.0; Status: Closed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • ChargeDescription: RESIST LAW ENFORCEMENT OFFICER W/OUT VIOLENCE; Disposition: Adjudicated Guilty; Count: 2; Statute: 843.02; Disposition Date: 2019-06-11; Offense Date: 2018-12-21; Sentence: Probation; Offence Level: MF; Plea: Nolo Contendere; Plea Date: 2019-06-11

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • ChargeDescription: DUI IMPAIRMENT OF DUBAL .15 OR ABOVE - 1 PRIOR; Disposition: Adjudicated Guilty; Count: 1; Statute: 316.193(4); Disposition Date: 2019-06-11; Offense Date: 2018-12-21; Sentence: Probation; Citation: 0756XEG; Offence Level: MF; Plea: Nolo Contendere; Plea Date: 2019-06-11

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • ArrestArresting Agency: LAKE COUNTY SHERIFFS OFFICE; Agency Number: LC; Incident #: 180166900

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer AZCANO, ROBERT C