This case was last updated from Lake County Florida Courts on 03/20/2020 at 13:11:40 (UTC).

WHITTINGTON, CHRISTOPHER SHAWN

Case Summary

On 08/28/2017 WHITTINGTON, CHRISTOPHER SHAWN was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Lake County Florida Courts, Lake County Courthouse located in Lake, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SINGELTARY, G RICHARD. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    08/28/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Lake, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SINGELTARY, G RICHARD

 

Party Details

Defendant

WHITTINGTON, CHRISTOPHER SHAWN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

KIM, JAE HEE

BOGGUS, AMANDA J

 

Court Documents

ARREST AFFIDAVIT AND ORDER DETERMINING PROBABLE CAUSE

08/28/2017 ARREST AFFIDAVIT AND ORDER DETERMINING PROBABLE CAUSE

UNIFORM TRAFFIC CITATION FILED FOR 316.1935(3), $0.00; A33G2NP 8/25/2017 EUSTIS POLICE DEPARTMENT 316.1935(3) $0.00; Count: 1

08/28/2017 UNIFORM TRAFFIC CITATION FILED FOR 316.1935(3), $0.00; A33G2NP 8/25/2017 EUSTIS POLICE DEPARTMENT 316.1935(3) $0.00; Count: 1

UNIFORM TRAFFIC CITATION FILED FOR 322.03(1), $0.00; A23S7YP 8/25/2017 EUSTIS POLICE DEPARTMENT 322.03(1) $0.00; Count: 2

08/28/2017 UNIFORM TRAFFIC CITATION FILED FOR 322.03(1), $0.00; A23S7YP 8/25/2017 EUSTIS POLICE DEPARTMENT 322.03(1) $0.00; Count: 2

BOND DISCHARGED

09/05/2018 BOND DISCHARGED

BOND DISCHARGED

09/05/2018 BOND DISCHARGED

CONTRACT FOR PARTIAL PAYMENTS SIGNED; OWES $25.00 SERVICE CHARGE; $1460.50 FOR 28 MONTHS @ 53.00 PER BL

09/05/2018 CONTRACT FOR PARTIAL PAYMENTS SIGNED; OWES $25.00 SERVICE CHARGE; $1460.50 FOR 28 MONTHS @ 53.00 PER BL

WAIVER OF RIGHTS AND AGREEMENT TO ENTER PLEA

09/05/2018 WAIVER OF RIGHTS AND AGREEMENT TO ENTER PLEA

SENTENCING GUIDELINES SCORESHEET

09/05/2018 SENTENCING GUIDELINES SCORESHEET

ORDER ASSESSING INCARCERATION/CORRECTIONS COSTS

09/05/2018 ORDER ASSESSING INCARCERATION/CORRECTIONS COSTS

ARREST AFFIDAVIT; SNT'D TO 6 MTHS LCJ

09/14/2018 ARREST AFFIDAVIT; SNT'D TO 6 MTHS LCJ

SENTENCE

09/18/2018 SENTENCE

PROBABLE CAUSE VIOLATION OF PROBATION ARREST; SERVED

05/01/2019 PROBABLE CAUSE VIOLATION OF PROBATION ARREST; SERVED

VIOLATION REPORT

05/03/2019 VIOLATION REPORT

AFFIDAVIT OF VIOLATION OF PROBATION

05/03/2019 AFFIDAVIT OF VIOLATION OF PROBATION

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/04/2019
  • HearingEvent Type: CFSNTPD - FELONY SENTENCING PUBLIC DEFENDER; Location: TAVARES; Room: GRS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • DocketDescription: RETURN OF SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • DocketDescription: STATE SUPPLEMENTAL DISCOVERY EXHIBIT; Text: #2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • HearingEvent Type: CFPNCPD - PLEA NEGOTIATION CONFERENCE (PD); Location: TAVARES; Room: GRS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • DocketDescription: RETURN OF SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2019
  • DocketDescription: NOTICE TO DEFT AND ATTORNEY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • HearingEvent Type: CFSNTPD - FELONY SENTENCING PUBLIC DEFENDER; Location: TAVARES; Room: GRS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • DocketDescription: MINUTES OF COURT PROCEEDING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • DocketDescription: CONTINUED TO 11/04/2019 1:30 PM CFSNTPD - FELONY SENTENCING PUBLIC DEFENDER; Text: 11/04/2019 1:30 PM CFSNTPD - FELONY SENTENCING PUBLIC DEFENDER SINGELTARY, G RICHARD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • DocketDescription: CONTINUED TO 10/29/2019 8:45 AM CFPNCPD - PLEA NEGOTIATION CONFERENCE (PD); Text: 10/29/2019 8:45 AM CFPNCPD - PLEA NEGOTIATION CONFERENCE (PD) SINGELTARY, G RICHARD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
241 More Docket Entries
  • 08/28/2017
  • DocketDescription: 322.03(1) NO VALID DL; Text: 322.03(1); Count: 2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/28/2017
  • DocketDescription: 316.1935(3) FLEE/ELUDE POLICE-HIGH SPEED FLEEING/ELUDING LE OFFICER WHEN LIGHTS/SIRENS ACTIVATED; Text: 316.1935(3); Count: 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: UNIFORM TRAFFIC CITATION FILED FOR 322.03(1), $0.00; Text: A23S7YP 8/25/2017 EUSTIS POLICE DEPARTMENT 322.03(1) $0.00; Count: 2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: UNIFORM TRAFFIC CITATION FILED FOR 316.1935(3), $0.00; Text: A33G2NP 8/25/2017 EUSTIS POLICE DEPARTMENT 316.1935(3) $0.00; Count: 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ARREST AFFIDAVIT AND ORDER DETERMINING PROBABLE CAUSE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2017
  • BondBond #: PSE5 65815; Type: Surety; Count: 2; Bondsman: ALL HOURS BAIL BONDS; Suerety Company: Palmetto Surety Corporation; Closed Date: 2018-09-05; Amount: 1000.0; Status: Closed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2017
  • BondBond #: PSE5 65814; Type: Surety; Count: 1; Bondsman: ALL HOURS BAIL BONDS; Suerety Company: Palmetto Surety Corporation; Closed Date: 2018-09-05; Amount: 5000.0; Status: Closed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2017
  • ArrestArresting Agency: EUSTIS POLICE DEPARTMENT; Agency Number: C4; Incident #: E17082576

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2017
  • ChargeDescription: NO VALID DRIVERS LICENSE; Disposition: Adjudicated Guilty; Count: 2; Statute: 322.03(1); Disposition Date: 2018-09-05; Offense Date: 2017-08-25; Citation: A23S7YP; Offence Level: MS; Plea: Nolo Contendere; Plea Date: 2018-09-05

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2017
  • ChargeDescription: FELONY FLEEING OR ATTEMPTING TO ELUDE-3RD DEG; Disposition: Adjudicated Guilty; Count: 1; Statute: 316.1935(2); Disposition Date: 2018-09-05; Offense Date: 2017-08-25; Sentence: Probation; Citation: A33G2NP; Offence Level: FT; Plea: Nolo Contendere; Plea Date: 2018-09-05

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BOGGUS, AMANDA J

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KIM, JAE HEE