This case was last updated from Lake County Courts on 03/19/2020 at 13:10:18 (UTC).

WALKER, DARRELL ANTONIO

Case Summary

On 09/24/2019 WALKER, DARRELL ANTONIO was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Lake County Courts, Lake County Courthouse located in Lake, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DAVIS, HEIDI. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    09/24/2019

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Lake County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Lake County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Lake, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DAVIS, HEIDI

 

Party Details

Defendant

WALKER, DARRELL ANTONIO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

KELLY, JAMES PATRICK

CAMEROTA, JOHN J

SCHLARF, SHANNON DANIELLE

 

Court Documents

SENTENCE

01/13/2020: SENTENCE

MINUTES OF COURT PROCEEDING

01/06/2020: MINUTES OF COURT PROCEEDING

STATE'S DISCOVERY EXHIBIT

12/17/2019: STATE'S DISCOVERY EXHIBIT

NOTICE TO DEFT AND ATTORNEY; DEFENDANT AS NO GOOD ADDRESS /NOT SENT

12/12/2019: NOTICE TO DEFT AND ATTORNEY; DEFENDANT AS NO GOOD ADDRESS /NOT SENT

MINUTES OF COURT PROCEEDING

12/09/2019: MINUTES OF COURT PROCEEDING

NOTICE TO DEFT AND ATTORNEY; ***NGA / NOT SENT***

11/14/2019: NOTICE TO DEFT AND ATTORNEY; ***NGA / NOT SENT***

CLERK'S WORKSHEET

11/12/2019: CLERK'S WORKSHEET

MINUTES OF COURT PROCEEDING

11/12/2019: MINUTES OF COURT PROCEEDING

INFORMATION FILED

10/28/2019: INFORMATION FILED

CLERK'S WORKSHEET

10/21/2019: CLERK'S WORKSHEET

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT, DEFENDANT'S PLEA OF NOT GUILTY AND NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

10/01/2019: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT, DEFENDANT'S PLEA OF NOT GUILTY AND NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

ORDER ON FIRST APPEARANCE REGARDING COUNSEL - APPOINTED

09/24/2019: ORDER ON FIRST APPEARANCE REGARDING COUNSEL - APPOINTED

ARREST AFFIDAVIT AND ORDER DETERMINING PROBABLE CAUSE

09/24/2019 ARREST AFFIDAVIT AND ORDER DETERMINING PROBABLE CAUSE

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/09/2020
  • HearingEvent Type: CANCELLED - CFTRIAL - TRIAL; Location: TAVARES; Room: HD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • HearingEvent Type: CANCELLED - CFPTC - PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE; Location: TAVARES; Room: HD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • HearingEvent Type: CANCELLED - CFSNTPD - FELONY SENTENCING PUBLIC DEFENDER; Location: TAVARES; Room: HD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • HearingEvent Type: CANCELLED - CFPNCPD - PLEA NEGOTIATION CONFERENCE (PD); Location: TAVARES; Room: HD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SENTENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • DocketDescription: JUDGMENT AND FINGERPRINTS; Book: 5406; Page: 149

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • DocketDescription: UNIFORM COMMITMENT TO THE CUSTODY OF DEPT OF CORRECTIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • HearingEvent Type: CFRD - ROCKET DOCKET; Location: TAVARES; Room: HD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • SentenceConfinement: State Prison; Term: Jail Time: 5 years 5 months 3 days; Credit Time: Credit Time: 109 days

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • FinancialDescription: #Lake - Criminal Recording Fee ($5); Amount Due: 5.0; Balance: 5.0; Due Date: 2025-06-12; In Judgement: 2020-01-09

    Read MoreRead Less
67 More Docket Entries
  • 09/24/2019
  • FinancialDescription: #Lake - Criminal Public Defender Application Fee; Amount Due: 50.0; Balance: 50.0; Due Date: 2025-06-12; In Judgement: 2020-01-09

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • DocketDescription: SCHEDULING LETTER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • DocketDescription: SET ON CFARR - FELONY ARRAIGNMENT DOCKET 10/21/2019 BEGINNING AT 8:30 AM HILL, MARK J; Text: CFARR - FELONY ARRAIGNMENT 10/21/2019 8:30 AM HILL, MARK J

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • DocketDescription: FELONY AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENT STATUS - QUALIFIES FOR PUBLIC DEFENDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • DocketDescription: FIRST APPEARANCE REFUSAL FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ORDER ON FIRST APPEARANCE REGARDING COUNSEL - APPOINTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • DocketDescription: 893.13(6A) POSSESSION OF METHAMPHETAMINE; Text: 893.13(6a); Count: 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ARREST AFFIDAVIT AND ORDER DETERMINING PROBABLE CAUSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • ChargeDescription: POSSESSION OF METHAMPHETAMINE; Disposition: Adjudicated Guilty; Count: 1; Statute: 893.13(6a); Disposition Date: 2020-01-09; Offense Date: 2019-09-23; Offence Level: FT; Plea: Nolo Contendere; Plea Date: 2020-01-09

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • ArrestArresting Agency: LAKE COUNTY SHERIFFS OFFICE; Agency Number: LC; Incident #: 190126801

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer SCHLARF, SHANNON DANIELLE

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CAMEROTA, JOHN J

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KELLY, JAMES PATRICK