This case was last updated from Lake County Courts on 04/08/2021 at 19:59:23 (UTC).

VELEZ, SARAH RENEE

Case Summary

On 02/04/2020 VELEZ, SARAH RENEE was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Lake County Courts, Lake County Courthouse located in Lake, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DAVIS, HEIDI. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    02/04/2020

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Lake County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Lake County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Lake, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DAVIS, HEIDI

 

Party Details

Defendant

VELEZ, SARAH RENEE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

KELLY, JAMES PATRICK

LINEBERGER, KENNETH LOGAN

ARCHER, LENIS

MORRIS, NICOLE MARIE

 

Court Documents

STATE SUPPLEMENTAL DISCOVERY EXHIBIT; # 1

03/10/2020: STATE SUPPLEMENTAL DISCOVERY EXHIBIT; # 1

MINUTES OF COURT PROCEEDING

03/02/2020: MINUTES OF COURT PROCEEDING

CLERK'S WORKSHEET

03/02/2020: CLERK'S WORKSHEET

INFORMATION FILED

02/28/2020: INFORMATION FILED

STATE'S DISCOVERY EXHIBIT

02/27/2020: STATE'S DISCOVERY EXHIBIT

BOND - AMOUNT $1,000.00, COMPANY Allegheny Casualty Company CA; Count: 2

02/05/2020: BOND - AMOUNT $1,000.00, COMPANY Allegheny Casualty Company CA; Count: 2

BOND - AMOUNT $2,000.00, COMPANY Allegheny Casualty Company CA; Count: 1

02/05/2020: BOND - AMOUNT $2,000.00, COMPANY Allegheny Casualty Company CA; Count: 1

FELONY AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENT STATUS - QUALIFIES FOR PUBLIC DEFENDER

02/04/2020: FELONY AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENT STATUS - QUALIFIES FOR PUBLIC DEFENDER

ORDER ON FIRST APPEARANCE REGARDING COUNSEL - APPOINTED

02/04/2020: ORDER ON FIRST APPEARANCE REGARDING COUNSEL - APPOINTED

NOTICE TO DEFT, ATTORNEY AND BONDSMEN

03/04/2020: NOTICE TO DEFT, ATTORNEY AND BONDSMEN

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT, DEFENDANT'S PLEA OF NOT GUILTY AND NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

02/12/2020: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT, DEFENDANT'S PLEA OF NOT GUILTY AND NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

ARREST AFFIDAVIT AND ORDER DETERMINING PROBABLE CAUSE

02/04/2020: ARREST AFFIDAVIT AND ORDER DETERMINING PROBABLE CAUSE

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/01/2021
  • HearingEvent Type: CANCELLED - CFSNTPD - FELONY SENTENCING PUBLIC DEFENDER; Location: TAVARES; Room: HD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • HearingEvent Type: CANCELLED - CFPNCPD - PLEA NEGOTIATION CONFERENCE (PD); Location: TAVARES; Room: HD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • DocketDescription: Cancelled CFPNCPD - PLEA NEGOTIATION CONFERENCE (PD) on 02/23/2021 9:00:00 AM due to

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • DocketDescription: Cancelled CFSNTPD - FELONY SENTENCING PUBLIC DEFENDER on 03/01/2021 9:00:00 AM due to

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • HearingEvent Type: CFSNTPD - FELONY SENTENCING PUBLIC DEFENDER; Location: TAVARES; Room: HD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • DocketDescription: MINUTES OF COURT PROCEEDING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • DocketDescription: CONTINUED TO INVALID DATE03/01/2021 9:00 AM; Text: CFSNTPD - FELONY SENTENCING PUBLIC DEFENDER 03/01/2021 9:00 AM DAVIS, HEIDI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • DocketDescription: CONTINUED TO INVALID DATE02/23/2021 9:00 AM; Text: CFPNCPD - PLEA NEGOTIATION CONFERENCE (PD) 02/23/2021 9:00 AM DAVIS, HEIDI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • DocketDescription: DEFT NOT PRESENT; Text: DEFT NOT PRESENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • DocketDescription: COMMUNICATION FROM; Text: DOC TO SAO RE: PTI REINSTATED

    Read MoreRead Less
74 More Docket Entries
  • 02/04/2020
  • BondType: Set by Judge; Count: 2; Closed Date: 2020-02-06; Amount: 1000.0; Status: Closed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • BondType: Set by Judge; Count: 1; Closed Date: 2020-02-06; Amount: 2000.0; Status: Closed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • ArrestArresting Agency: CLERMONT POLICE DEPARTMENT; Agency Number: C3; Incident #: 20C04210

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • FinancialDescription: #Lake - Criminal Public Defender Application Fee; Amount Due: 50.0; Balance: 50.0; Due Date: 2020-02-04

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: FELONY AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENT STATUS - QUALIFIES FOR PUBLIC DEFENDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ORDER ON FIRST APPEARANCE REGARDING COUNSEL - APPOINTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • DocketDescription: SET ON CFARR - FELONY ARRAIGNMENT DOCKET 3/2/2020 BEGINNING AT 8:30 AM DAVIS, HEIDI; Text: CFARR - FELONY ARRAIGNMENT 3/2/2020 8:30 AM DAVIS, HEIDI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • DocketDescription: 893.13(6)(B) POSSESSION OF MARIJUANA UNDER 20 GRAMS; Text: 893.13(6)(b); Count: 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • DocketDescription: 893.13(6A) POSSESSION OF CONTROLLED SUBSTANCE (ECSTASY); Text: 893.13(6a); Count: 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ARREST AFFIDAVIT AND ORDER DETERMINING PROBABLE CAUSE

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer KELLY, JAMES PATRICK

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MORRIS, NICOLE MARIE

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LINEBERGER, KENNETH LOGAN