This case was last updated from Lake County Courts on 03/08/2020 at 05:33:19 (UTC).

TUCKER, LUKE ELLIOT

Case Summary

On 12/02/2019 TUCKER, LUKE ELLIOT was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Lake County Courts, Lake County Courthouse located in Lake, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SINGELTARY, G RICHARD. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    12/02/2019

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Courthouse:

    Lake County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Lake, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SINGELTARY, G RICHARD

 

Party Details

Defendant

TUCKER, LUKE ELLIOT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

AYRIS, BENJAMIN

KIM, JAE HEE

WIGGS, JEFFREY W

 

Court Documents

SENTENCE

02/05/2020: SENTENCE

JUDGMENT AND FINGERPRINTS; Book: 5419; Page: 121

02/05/2020: JUDGMENT AND FINGERPRINTS; Book: 5419; Page: 121

REQUEST FOR:; PRODUCTION; NOTICE OF FILING; AND PROOF OF SERVICE

01/24/2020: REQUEST FOR:; PRODUCTION; NOTICE OF FILING; AND PROOF OF SERVICE

STATE SUPPLEMENTAL DISCOVERY EXHIBIT; #2

01/23/2020: STATE SUPPLEMENTAL DISCOVERY EXHIBIT; #2

STATE SUPPLEMENTAL DISCOVERY EXHIBIT; #1

01/09/2020: STATE SUPPLEMENTAL DISCOVERY EXHIBIT; #1

NOTICE OF INTENT TO PARTICIPATE IN DISCOVERY

12/26/2019: NOTICE OF INTENT TO PARTICIPATE IN DISCOVERY

STATE'S DISCOVERY EXHIBIT

12/17/2019: STATE'S DISCOVERY EXHIBIT

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT, DEFENDANT'S PLEA OF NOT GUILTY AND NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

12/12/2019: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT, DEFENDANT'S PLEA OF NOT GUILTY AND NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

INFORMATION FILED

12/10/2019: INFORMATION FILED

SCHEDULING LETTER

12/03/2019: SCHEDULING LETTER

FELONY AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENT STATUS - QUALIFIES FOR PUBLIC DEFENDER

12/02/2019: FELONY AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENT STATUS - QUALIFIES FOR PUBLIC DEFENDER

FIRST APPEARANCE REFUSAL FORM

12/02/2019: FIRST APPEARANCE REFUSAL FORM

INVESTIGATIVE COST RECOVERY REPORT

12/02/2019: INVESTIGATIVE COST RECOVERY REPORT

ORDER ON FIRST APPEARANCE REGARDING COUNSEL - APPOINTED

12/02/2019: ORDER ON FIRST APPEARANCE REGARDING COUNSEL - APPOINTED

ARREST AFFIDAVIT AND ORDER DETERMINING PROBABLE CAUSE

12/02/2019: ARREST AFFIDAVIT AND ORDER DETERMINING PROBABLE CAUSE

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

02/10/2020

DocketDescription: ANNOUNCEMENT OF NO INFORMATION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/05/2020
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: SENTENCE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/05/2020
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: JUDGMENT AND FINGERPRINTS; Book: 5419; Page: 121

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/27/2020

HearingEvent Type: CFSNTPR - FELONY SENTENCING PRIV ATTY; Location: TAVARES; Room: GRS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/27/2020

HearingEvent Type: CANCELLED - CFSNTPD - FELONY SENTENCING PUBLIC DEFENDER; Location: TAVARES; Room: GRS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/27/2020

SentenceConfinement: County Jail; Term: Jail Time: 11 months 29 days; Credit Time: Credit Time: 61 days

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/27/2020

SentenceConfinement: County Jail; Term: Jail Time: 11 months 29 days; Credit Time: Credit Time: 61 days

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/27/2020

FinancialDescription: #Lake - Criminal Costs of Incarceration (960.293); Amount Due: 18200.0; Balance: 18200.0; Due Date: 2020-01-28

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/27/2020

FinancialDescription: #Lake - Criminal Recording Fee ($5); Amount Due: 5.0; Balance: 5.0; Due Date: 2021-01-25; In Judgement: 2020-01-27

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/27/2020

FinancialDescription: #Lake - Criminal Recording & Satisfaction Fees ($22); Amount Due: 22.0; Balance: 22.0; Due Date: 2020-01-28

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
111 More Docket Entries
11/28/2019

ChargeDescription: POSSESSION OF MARIJUANA UNDER 20 GRAMS; Disposition: Announcement of No Information In Open Court; Count: 9; Statute: 893.13(6)(b); Disposition Date: 2020-01-27; Offense Date: 2019-11-28; Offence Level: MF; Plea: Not Guilty; Plea Date: 2019-12-12

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/28/2019

ChargeDescription: POSSESSION OF FIREARM WITH ALTERED SERIAL NUMBER; Disposition: Announcement of No Information In Open Court; Count: 8; Statute: 790.27(2); Disposition Date: 2020-01-27; Offense Date: 2019-11-28; Offence Level: MF; Plea: Not Guilty; Plea Date: 2019-12-12

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/28/2019

ChargeDescription: POSSESSION OF METHAMPHETAMINE; Disposition: Announcement of No Information In Open Court; Count: 7; Statute: 893.13(6a); Disposition Date: 2020-01-27; Offense Date: 2019-11-28; Offence Level: FT; Plea: Not Guilty; Plea Date: 2019-12-12

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/28/2019

ChargeDescription: POSSESSION OF AMMUNITION BY CONVICTED FELON; Disposition: Announcement of No Information In Open Court; Count: 6; Statute: 790.23(1a); Disposition Date: 2020-01-27; Offense Date: 2019-11-28; Offence Level: FS; Plea: Not Guilty; Plea Date: 2019-12-12

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/28/2019

ChargeDescription: POSSESSION OF AMMUNITION BY CONVICTED FELON; Disposition: Announcement of No Information In Open Court; Count: 5; Statute: 790.23(1a); Disposition Date: 2020-01-27; Offense Date: 2019-11-28; Offence Level: FS; Plea: Not Guilty; Plea Date: 2019-12-12

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/28/2019

ChargeDescription: POSSESSION OF AMMUNITION BY CONVICTED FELON; Disposition: Announcement of No Information In Open Court; Count: 4; Statute: 790.23(1a); Disposition Date: 2020-01-27; Offense Date: 2019-11-28; Offence Level: FS; Plea: Not Guilty; Plea Date: 2019-12-12

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/28/2019

ChargeDescription: POSSESSION OF AMMUNITION BY CONVICTED FELON; Disposition: Announcement of No Information In Open Court; Count: 3; Statute: 790.23(1a); Disposition Date: 2020-01-27; Offense Date: 2019-11-28; Offence Level: FS; Plea: Not Guilty; Plea Date: 2019-12-12

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/28/2019

ChargeDescription: CARRYING A CONCEALED FIREARM; Disposition: Adjudicated Guilty; Count: 2; Statute: 790.01(2); Disposition Date: 2020-01-27; Offense Date: 2019-11-28; Offence Level: FT; Plea: Nolo Contendere; Plea Date: 2020-01-27

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/28/2019

ChargeDescription: POSSESSION OF FIREARM/AMMUNITION BY FELON; Disposition: Adjudicated Guilty; Count: 1; Statute: 790.23(1a); Disposition Date: 2020-01-27; Offense Date: 2019-11-28; Offence Level: FS; Plea: Nolo Contendere; Plea Date: 2020-01-27

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/28/2019

ArrestArresting Agency: GROVELAND POLICE DEPARTMENT; Agency Number: C36; Incident #: G19113148

[+] Read More [-] Read Less